Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2811198


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019 [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
15.02.2019 (Expected) grant published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
15.02.2019 Change - inventor
08.02.2019 New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent
08.02.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.02.2019 Change - classification published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
01.02.2019 Change - classification published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
28.01.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.01.2019 Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.01.2019 Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.01.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
25.01.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.09.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.08.2018 Change - classification published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
31.08.2018 Change - classification published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
02.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2016 Change - request for examination published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
15.07.2016 Amendment by applicant
05.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2015 Change - classification published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
04.12.2015 Change - classification published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
04.12.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  06.01.2016  [2016/01]
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
06.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
04.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication