Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2811198 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380007482 EP13742940



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9593731Global Dossier 14.03.2017B2
US2014367902 18.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP52080 30.01.2013
JP2012019046 31.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6033796BGlobal Dossier 30.11.2016B2
JPWO2013115266 11.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP52080 30.01.2013
JP2012019046 31.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104081079BGlobal Dossier 13.01.2016B
CN104081079 01.10.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013JP52080 30.01.2013
JP2012019046 31.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2811198Global Dossier 20.03.2019B1
EP2811198 06.01.2016A4
EP2811198 10.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013JP52080 30.01.2013
JP2012019046 31.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013115266Global Dossier 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012019046 31.01.2012