Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811198

EP2811198 - RING-SHAPED SPRING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.09.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, CZ, EE, RO, SK
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NHK Spring Co., Ltd.
10, Fukuura 3-chome
Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
[2019/12]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Nhk Spring Co., Ltd.
10 Fukuura 3-chome Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAMURA, Noritoshi
c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD.
4056 Aza-Sakuradai
Nakatsu
Aikawa-machi
Aikoh-gun Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Fumio
c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD.
4056 Aza-Sakuradai
Nakatsu
Aikawa-machi
Aikoh-gun Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP
 [2019/12]
Former [2014/50]01 / TAKAMURA, Noritoshi
c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD.
4056 Aza-Sakuradai
Nakatsu
Aikawa-machi
Aikoh-gun Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Fumio
c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD.
4056 Aza-Sakuradai
Nakatsu
Aikawa-machi
Aikoh-gun Kanagawa 243-0303 / JP
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13742940.330.01.2013
[2019/12]
WO2013JP52080
Priority number, dateJP2012001904631.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012019046
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115266
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811198
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811198
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B21D11/10, B23P15/00, B23K26/26, B23K26/32, C21D9/02, C22C38/02, C22C38/08, C22C38/34, C22C38/38, F16F1/02, C21D6/00, C22C38/04, C22C38/18, // B21D53/16, B23K101/32, B23K103/04, B23K103/00
[2018/40]
Former International [2014/50]F16F1/32, B21D11/10, B21D53/00, C22C38/00, C22C38/38, F16F1/02, C21D9/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RINGFÖRMIGE FEDER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2014/50]
English:RING-SHAPED SPRING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2014/50]
French:RESSORT DE FORME ANNULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2014Translation filed 
01.09.2014National basic fee paid 
01.09.2014Search fee paid 
01.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
01.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.01.2019Fee for grant paid
18.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
08.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2019/48]ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2011006467  (MIZUNO EIJI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,5,7 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 1, 2, 10 * [Y] 2,3,6 [I] 4;
 [Y]US6206984  (INADA ATSUSHI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 2,3 * table 1 * * claims 1, 4-9, 11 *;
 [Y]DE202011002271U  (SCHERDEL INNOTEC FORSCHUNGS UND ENTWICKLUNGS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]WO2011078165  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]; NAGAMATSU SAYAKA; MARUO TOMOTADA; YOSHIHARA NAO) [A] 1-7 * tables 1-4 * * claim 1 *
International search[X]JP2011021624  (CHUO SPRING CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2011149089  (KOBE STEEL, LTD.);
 [Y]DE202011002271U  (SCHERDEL INNOTEC FORSCHUNGS-UND ENTWICKLUNGS-GMBH);
 [A]JP2007198598  (MUHR UND BENDER KG);
 [A]JP2001225112  (TOGO SEISAKUSYO CORP.);
 [A]JP2003329072  (NHK PRECISION CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011052777  (CHUO SPRING CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH06106277  (NHK PRECISION CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH08135706  (MOLITEC STEEL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2007186795  (KOBE STEEL, LTD.);
 [A]JP2006183136  (NIPPON STEEL CORP.);
 [A]JP2004009126  (NIPPON STEEL CORP.)
by applicantJPH06106277
 JP2001225112