Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2810627 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2810627



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 213
18.07.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.07.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.07.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.04.2019 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
02.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.05.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
02.05.2016 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
23.10.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
06.10.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
28.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.01.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
09.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
20.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
20.08.2014 Description Search / examination 54
20.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.08.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
17.07.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
27.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 30
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 43