Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2810627 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380007474 EP13743049



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9920954Global Dossier 20.03.2018B2
US2014345595 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012018368 31.01.2012
JP2013015526 30.01.2013
WO2013JP52177 31.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104093382BGlobal Dossier 19.04.2017B
CN104093382 08.10.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012018368 31.01.2012
JP2013015526 30.01.2013
WO2013JP52177 31.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2810627Global Dossier 04.11.2015A4
EP2810627 10.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012018368 31.01.2012
JP2013015526 30.01.2013
WO2013JP52177 31.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1209014 24.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
JP2012018368 31.01.2012
JP2013015526 30.01.2013
WO2013JP52177 31.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013115306Global Dossier 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012018368 31.01.2012
JP2013015526 30.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2013176549Global Dossier 09.09.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012018368 31.01.2012
JP2013015526 30.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI630932B 01.08.2018B
TW201343208 01.11.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012018368 31.01.2012
JP2013015526 30.01.2013