Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810627

EP2810627 - HEATING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.07.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kobayashi Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
4-10, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / NISHIOKA, Daisuke
c/o KIRIBAI CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
10-5 Niitaka 1-chome
Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0033 / JP
02 / YASUDA, Yuki
c/o KIRIBAI CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
10-5 Niitaka 1-chome
Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0033 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Hiromichi
c/o KIRIBAI CHEMICAL CO. LTD.
10-5 Niitaka 1-chome
Yodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0033 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13743049.231.01.2013
WO2013JP52177
Priority number, dateJP2012001836831.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012018368
JP2013001552630.01.2013         Original published format: JP 2013015526
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115306
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810627
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F7/03, // A61F7/00, A61F7/02
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/50]A61F7/03
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:ERWÄRMUNGSWERKZEUG[2014/50]
English:HEATING TOOL[2014/50]
French:OUTIL CHAUFFANT[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2014Translation filed 
30.08.2014National basic fee paid 
30.08.2014Search fee paid 
30.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
02.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.07.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1506756  (MYCOAL WARMERS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-12 * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0221] * * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0285] * [I] 4,5;
 [A]JP2004073828  (KAO CORP) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0058] *
International search[X]JP4093348B  (MYCOAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010051690  (KAO CORP);
 [A]JP2011160885  (KAO CORP);
 [A]JP2009062250  (ECO CARBON KK)
by applicantJP2004180959
 JP2010022405
 JP2001218816
 JP2010051690