Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810680

EP2810680 - CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIBATA, Hideaki
c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
1500 Inokuchi
Nakai-machi
Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP
02 / ISHII, Naoki
c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
1500 Inokuchi
Nakai-machi
Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13743062.531.01.2013
[2016/25]
WO2013JP52249
Priority number, dateJP2012001885931.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012018859
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115330
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810680
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810680
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06, A61M25/04, C08J7/00, A61L29/00, A61M25/01, A61L29/04, A61M25/00, A61L29/14
[2016/07]
Former International [2015/39]A61M25/06, A61M25/00, A61L29/00, C08J7/00, A61M25/01, A61M25/04
Former International [2014/50]A61M25/06, A61M25/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATHETER[2014/50]
English:CATHETER[2014/50]
French:CATHÉTER[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014Translation filed 
21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Search fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
13.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2016Fee for grant paid
13.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2016
Opposition(s)23.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.01.2013
AL22.06.2016
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
BG22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
CH31.01.2017
GB31.01.2017
IE31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
MT31.01.2017
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU31.01.2013
AL22.06.2016
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
CH31.01.2017
GB31.01.2017
IE31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
MT31.01.2017
Former [2018/46]AL22.06.2016
AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
CH31.01.2017
GB31.01.2017
IE31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
MT31.01.2017
Former [2018/43]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
CH31.01.2017
GB31.01.2017
IE31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
MT31.01.2017
Former [2018/13]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
CH31.01.2017
GB31.01.2017
IE31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
CH31.01.2017
GB31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
LU31.01.2017
Former [2017/45]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
MC22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/38]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
DK22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SI22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT22.06.2016
BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
ES22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
SM22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
PT24.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE22.06.2016
CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
PL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
SK22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
IS22.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ22.06.2016
EE22.06.2016
FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
IT22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RO22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
NL22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
SE22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
GR23.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI22.06.2016
HR22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
LV22.06.2016
RS22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI22.06.2016
LT22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT22.06.2016
NO22.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2005042646  (APPLIED MED RESOURCES [US]; BRUSTAD JOHN R [US]; HILAL NABIL [US]; JOH) [X] 1,10 * page 8, line 1 - page 15, line 23; figures 1-14 * [Y] 2;
 [I]WO9929362  (WILSON COOK MEDICAL INC [US]; REYDEL BORIS [US]) [I] 1-12 * page 11, line 8 - page 13, line 2; figure 1 * * page 14, line 18 - page 23, line 8; figures 6-27 *;
 [Y]EP0339799  (BARD INC C R [US]) [Y] 2 * abstract *;
 [A]GB1301393  (DAVIS S. SHERIDAN) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005171588  (WAHLSTROM DALE A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016] - [0038]; figures 1-7b *;
 [A]EP2258323  (BIOTRONIK VI PATENT AG [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0013] - [0031]; figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] *;
 [A]US5848987  (BAUDINO MICHAEL D [US] ET AL) [A] 1,4,8-10 * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 25; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP2110147  (ASTRA TECH AB [SE]) [A] 1,10,11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0033] * * paragraph [0065] *;
 [A]WO2009126550  (MED INST INC [US]; CHARLEBOIS STEVEN J [US]; DIERKING KURT W [US]; ORR) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0032] - [0044]; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US2008169059  (MESSERSMITH PHILLIP B [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0003] - [0010]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0065] - [0068] *
International search[A]JP2006230442  (NIPRO CORP.);
 [A]JP2010125227  (OLYMPUS CORP.)
by applicantJP2006230442