Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811741

EP2811741 - ENCODING DEVICE AND ENCODING METHOD, AND DECODING DEVICE AND DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.01.2020
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / HATTORI Shinobu
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / SAKURAI Hironari
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI Yoshitomo
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Jackson, Jonathan Andrew
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date13743221.723.01.2013
WO2013JP51265
Priority number, dateJP2012001902531.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012019025
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115025
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811741
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/597, H04N13/178, // H04N19/132, H04N19/174, H04N19/70
[2019/44]
Former International [2015/26]H04N19/597
Former International [2014/50]H04N7/26, H04N13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE ENTSCHLÜSSELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ENTSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN[2014/50]
English:ENCODING DEVICE AND ENCODING METHOD, AND DECODING DEVICE AND DECODING METHOD[2014/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE, ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014Translation filed 
24.07.2014National basic fee paid 
24.07.2014Search fee paid 
24.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
13.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
07.01.2020Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2387243  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - YOSHITOMO TAKAHASHI ET AL, "Descriptions of 3D Video Coding Proposal (HEVC-Compatible Category) by Sony", 98. MPEG MEETING; 28-11-2011 - 2-12-2011; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20111122), no. m22566, XP030051129 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "WD of MVC extension for inclusion of depth maps", 98. MPEG MEETING; 28-11-2011 - 2-12-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120105), no. N12351, XP030018846 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]JP2010525724  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]JP2010522494  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.);
 [A]JP2008518516  (SONY ELECTRONICS, INC.);
 [AE]WO2013031575  (SONY CORP [JP], et al)
by applicant   - THOMAS WIEGAND; WOO-JIN HAN; BENJAMIN BROSS; JENS-RAINER OHM; GARY J. SULLIVIAN, "WD3: Working Draf t3 of High-Efficiency Video Coding", JCTVC-E603_D5