Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810184

EP2810184 - FILTERING REDUNDANT CONSUMER TRANSACTION RULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/20]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GHOSH, Partha, Pratim
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
02 / KUMAR, Nagendra
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
03 / BOKIL, Hrushikesh
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13743295.128.01.2013
WO2013US23350
Priority number, dateUS20121336616103.02.2012         Original published format: US201213366161
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116123
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810184
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, G06Q30/02
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:FILTERUNG REDUNDANTER VERBRAUCHERTRANSAKTIONSREGELN[2014/50]
English:FILTERING REDUNDANT CONSUMER TRANSACTION RULES[2014/50]
French:FILTRAGE DE RÈGLES DE TRANSACTIONS DE CONSOMMATEURS REDONDANTES[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2014National basic fee paid 
04.07.2014Search fee paid 
04.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
14.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
26.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2010141270  (VISA U S A [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * claims 1,20 *;
 [I]US5943667  (AGGARWAL CHARU CHANDRA [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, lines 11-18 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 27 * * column 3, lines 53-59 * * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 67 * * column 7, lines 42-49 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [I]US2009171954  (LIU LI [CN], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] - [0024] * * abstract * * claims 1,2,15,16 *
International search[X]US7433879  (SHARMA NIRAD [US], et al);
 [A]US2010280881  (FAITH PATRICK [US], et al);
 [A]US2010100775  (SLUTSMAN LEV [US], et al);
 [A]US2007033185  (MAAG ANDREW [US]);
 [A]US2006143075  (CARR RYAN [US], et al)