Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810964

EP2810964 - BRANCHED CONJUGATED DIENE COPOLYMER, RUBBER COMPOSITION AND PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd.
6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / WASHIZU, Kensuke
c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD.
6-9 Wakinohama-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0072 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13743537.622.01.2013
[2016/46]
WO2013JP51186
Priority number, dateJP2012002036501.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012020365
JP2012021755428.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012217554
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115010
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810964
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810964
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08F236/06, C08F236/22, B60C1/00, C08F236/10, C08L9/00, C08L9/06
[2016/28]
Former International [2014/51]C08F236/22, B60C1/00, C08F236/10, C08L9/00, C08L9/06
Former International [2014/50]C08F236/22, B60C1/00, C08F236/10, C08L9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERZWEIGTES KONJUGIERTES DIENCOPOLYMER, KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND LUFTREIFEN[2014/50]
English:BRANCHED CONJUGATED DIENE COPOLYMER, RUBBER COMPOSITION AND PNEUMATIC TIRE[2014/50]
French:COPOLYMÈRE DE DIÈNE CONJUGUÉ RAMIFIÉ, COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PNEUMATIQUE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase08.07.2014Translation filed 
08.07.2014National basic fee paid 
08.07.2014Search fee paid 
08.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
02.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2015Observations by third parties
09.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2016Fee for grant paid
30.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2015
Opposition(s)17.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.01.2013
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CY16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG16.02.2017
GB16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU22.01.2013
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG16.02.2017
GB16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
MT22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG16.02.2017
GB16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE22.01.2017
LU22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG16.02.2017
GB16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/51]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
LU22.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
IT16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV16.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH05125225  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 8-14 * abstract * [A] 1-7;
 [A]JPH05125108  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1721914  (RIKEN [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010027463  (AMYRIS BIOTECHNOLOGIES INC [US]; MCPHEE DEREK JAMES [US]; GRAHAM MATTH) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010056714  (MCPHEE DEREK JAMES [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
International search[X]JPH05125108  (ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.);
 [X]JPH05125225  (ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPS63179908  (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2005085306  (RIKEN, JAPAN);
 [A]WO2010027463  (AMYRIS BIOTECHNOLOGIES, INC.);
 [A]WO2010027464  (AMYRIS BIOTECHNOLOGIES, INC.)
by applicantJPS63179908
 JP2008156516
otherWO2013151068
 EP2835386
 WO2013151069
 EP2835387
 WO2013151067
 EP2835383
 WO2013047347
 EP2762525