Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811565

EP2811565 - SOLID OXIDE FUEL BATTERY CELL, FUEL BATTERY MODULE, AND FUEL BATTERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / INOUE, Shushin
c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2017/32]
Former [2014/50]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13743577.230.01.2013
[2017/32]
WO2013JP52053
Priority number, dateJP2012001674430.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012016744
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115255
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811565
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811565
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/02, H01M4/86, H01M8/12, H01M4/90, H01M8/1213, H01M8/1004, H01M8/124, H01M8/1246, H01M8/1253, H01M8/2425, H01M8/0297, H01M8/126, H01M8/2475, // H01M8/24, H01M8/10
[2017/11]
Former International [2015/44]H01M8/02, H01M4/86, H01M8/12, H01M4/90, // H01M8/24, H01M8/10
Former International [2014/50]H01M8/02, H01M4/86, H01M8/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FESTOXID-BRENNSTOFFBATTERIEZELLE, BRENNSTOFFBATTERIEMODUL UND BRENNSTOFFBATTERIEVORRICHTUNG[2014/50]
English:SOLID OXIDE FUEL BATTERY CELL, FUEL BATTERY MODULE, AND FUEL BATTERY DEVICE[2014/50]
French:PILE DE BATTERIE À COMBUSTIBLE À OXYDE SOLIDE, MODULE DE BATTERIE DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE, DISPOSITIF DE BATTERIE À COMBUSTIBLE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2014Translation filed 
17.07.2014National basic fee paid 
17.07.2014Search fee paid 
17.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
29.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2017Fee for grant paid
29.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.03.2017
Opposition(s)11.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
IE30.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
IE30.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/49]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
LU30.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008248395  (HARADA USHIO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0012] - [0021] - [0023] * [I] 3,4,6;
 [A]EP2398103  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0032] , [0046] * * claims 1-13 *;
 [A]JP2006278089  (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] *;
 [A]JP2009099552  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] *
International search[A]JP2008258064  (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011249186  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORP.);
 [A]JP2008222511  (TOHO GAS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011238629  (KYOCERA CORP.);
 [A]JPH07254418  (TOTO LTD.)
by applicantJP2008078126
 JP2010003478