Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810958

EP2810958 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE FINE POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.10.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.2019New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Glass Company, Limited
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / HIGUCHI, Shinya
c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited
5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
02 / KOBAYASHI, Shigeki
c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited
5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
03 / NAGAI, Hiroki
c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited
5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2016/48]
Former [2014/50]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date13743739.830.01.2013
[2016/48]
WO2013JP52108
Priority number, dateJP2012002053002.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012020530
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115278
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810958
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810958
Date:30.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/26, C08F6/22, C08J3/16, C08F2/24
[2015/51]
Former International [2014/50]C08F2/26, C08F6/22, C08J3/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FEINEN POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENPULVERS[2014/50]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE FINE POWDER[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FINE POUDRE DE POLYTÉTRAFLUOROÉTHYLÈNE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2014Translation filed 
18.06.2014National basic fee paid 
18.06.2014Search fee paid 
18.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
13.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.10.2016Fee for grant paid
13.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.08.2017  05.09.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2017/41]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
05.10.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.10.2018Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.10.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition09.01.2019Appeal received No.  T0093/19
11.03.2019Statement of grounds filed
31.07.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.01.2013
AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
GB28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
GB28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
GB28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/51]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
LU30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/50]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SI30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
MC30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
BG28.02.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
SM30.11.2016
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT30.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
EE30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RO30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
SK30.11.2016
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT30.11.2016
CZ30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT30.11.2016
DK30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/31]AT30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
NL30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT30.11.2016
ES30.11.2016
FI30.11.2016
HR30.11.2016
LT30.11.2016
LV30.11.2016
PL30.11.2016
RS30.11.2016
SE30.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO28.02.2017
GR01.03.2017
PT30.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV30.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US6268469  (HIRAGA YOSHIYUKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * example 1 *
International search[A]JPH05186605  (HOECHST AG.);
 [A]JP2010037365  (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.);
 [A]WO2009142080  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2006095657  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.)
by applicantWO2005042593
 US2007142541
 US2008269408
 JP2010037365
OppositionWO2010110851
 EP2287209
 US2593583
 JPS49115190  * , accompanied by English translation (D4a) *
 JPS63101430  * , accompanied by English translation (D5a) *
 WO2011051168
 US2006252898
 JP3446377B  * , accompanied by English translation (D8a) *
 WO2011055824  * , accompanied by English language family member EP 2 500 366 A1 (D9a) *