Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798876

EP2798876 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS MEASUREMENTS AND CSI FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2016/16]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / XIAO, Weimin
5129 Chambers Dr.
Hoffman Estates, Illinois 60010 / US
02 / LIU, Jialing
663 W.Revere Lane
Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US
03 / QU, Bingyu
719 Belinder Ln.
Rolling Meadows, Illinois 60173 / US
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13743897.430.01.2013
[2016/16]
WO2013CN71105
Priority number, dateUS201261592417P30.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261592417 P
US20121373212931.12.2012         Original published format: US201213732129
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113273
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798876
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798876
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04L1/00, H04L1/06, H04B17/24, H04B17/309, // H04W24/10, H04W72/04, H04W28/06, H04W72/08, H04B7/06, H04W24/08, H04W88/02
[2015/46]
Former International [2015/01]H04W24/10, H04B17/00, H04L1/00, H04L1/06, H04L5/00, H04W28/06, H04W72/04, H04W72/08
Former International [2014/45]H04W24/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR MESSUNG DRAHTLOSER ÜBERTRAGUNGEN UND CSI-RÜCKKOPPLUNG[2015/46]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS MEASUREMENTS AND CSI FEEDBACK[2014/45]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURES DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL ET DE RETOUR DE CSI[2015/46]
Former [2014/45]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR MESSUNGEN DRAHTLOSER KOMMUNIKATIONEN UND CSI-RÜCKKOPPLUNG
Former [2014/45]SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉTROACTION DE MESURES DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL ET DE CSI
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Search fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
25.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2016Fee for grant paid
25.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16150704.1  / EP3026954
EP19172921.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2015
Opposition(s)23.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.01.2013
AL20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
CY20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU30.01.2013
AL20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
BG20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2019/31]HU30.01.2013
AL20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL20.04.2016
BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/47]BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
MC20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/37]BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SI20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/11]BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
SM20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/10]BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
SK20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/09]BE20.04.2016
CZ20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
EE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/07]BE20.04.2016
DK20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2017/03]BE20.04.2016
ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
IT20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/52]ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
SE20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/51]ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
GR21.07.2016
PT22.08.2016
Former [2016/50]ES20.04.2016
HR20.04.2016
LT20.04.2016
LV20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
RS20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/49]LT20.04.2016
NL20.04.2016
PL20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT20.04.2016
NO20.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - SAMSUNG, "Interference Measurement for Downlink CoMP", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-114228 INTERFERENCE MEASUREMENT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111108), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050562153 [X] 1,2,5,6,9-11,13,14 * figure 2 * * page 2 - page 4 * [I] 3,4,7,8,12,15
 [I]  - CATT, "Considerations on Reference Signal for Interference Measurement", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-113733, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111108), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050561852 [I] 1-15 * page 4 *
 [XP]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Resources for Interference Measurements", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-120032, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120201), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050563153 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[XP]CN102684835  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH);
 [XP]WO2012177092  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al);
 [XP]WO2012115811  (MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC [US], et al);
 [XP]WO2012099319  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al);
 [A]CN102149124  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH)
by applicant   - "Interference Measurement for Downlink CoMP", 3GPP DRAFT; RL-114228
    - "Consideration on Reference Signal for Interference Measurement", 3GPP DRAFT, RL-113733