Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2809888 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2809888



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1187
14.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
14.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
14.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
14.10.2019 Description Search / examination 5
14.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.10.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.08.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
12.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.07.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
03.07.2019 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 503
25.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 118
25.06.2019 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 366
25.06.2019 Observations by third parties Search / examination 14
02.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.04.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.03.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
28.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.05.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
21.09.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
16.09.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
15.09.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 5
27.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.05.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
27.05.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
27.05.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
17.11.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.10.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
30.10.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
22.10.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
14.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
14.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
14.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.08.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
13.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 18