Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2809888


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.10.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.08.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.06.2019 New entry: Observations by third parties
29.03.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.03.2019 First examination report
29.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.05.2018 Change - representative
26.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.09.2016 Change - applicant published on  26.10.2016  [2016/43]
11.06.2016 Amendment by applicant
03.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2015 Change - classification published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.11.2015 Change - classification published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.11.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
18.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
21.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
11.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication