Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809888

EP2809888 - GEARED TURBOMACHINE ARCHITECTURE HAVING A LOW PROFILE CORE FLOW PATH CONTOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2016/43]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SUCIU, Gabriel, L.
27 Tanglewood Drive
Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US
02 / MERRY, Brian D.
220 Bear Swamp Road
Andover, Connecticut 06232 / US
03 / HASEL, Karl L.
201 Shallowbrook Lane
Manchester, Connecticut 06040 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date13743906.318.01.2013
WO2013US22032
Priority number, dateUS201261593230P31.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261593230 P
US20121336479802.02.2012         Original published format: US201213364798
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116009
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809888
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:F01D15/12, F01D25/26, F01D25/28, F03D11/02, F03D11/04, F03D5/00, F03B11/00, F04D29/60, F04D29/54, F02K3/06, F02C3/107, F02C7/04, F04D29/52
[2015/49]
Former International [2014/50]F01D15/12, F01D25/26, F01D25/28, F03D11/02, F03D11/04, F03D5/00, F03B11/00, F04D29/60
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:GETRIEBETURBOMASCHINENAUFBAU MIT EINER FLACHEN KERNSTRÖMUNGSWEGKONTUR[2014/50]
English:GEARED TURBOMACHINE ARCHITECTURE HAVING A LOW PROFILE CORE FLOW PATH CONTOUR[2014/50]
French:ARCHITECTURE DE TURBOMACHINE À ENGRENAGE À CONTOUR PLAT DE TRAJET DE FLUX PRIMAIRE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2014National basic fee paid 
21.08.2014Search fee paid 
21.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
27.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2019Observations by third parties
14.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009081039  (MCCUNE MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0017]; figures 2,3 * [I] 6-8;
 [A]US2010251696  (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024]; figures 2,4 *
International search[X]US2009081039  (MCCUNE MICHAEL E [US], et al);
 [Y]US5553449  (RODGERS JOSEPH H [US], et al);
 [A]US3971208  (SCHWENT GLENNON V);
 [A]US4251987  (ADAMSON ARTHUR P);
 [A]US2010170224  (CLARK DAVID SCOTT [US], et al)
by applicantUS2009081039
other   - D.E. GRAY et al., "Energy Efficient Engine, Preliminary Design and Integration Studies", NASA Technical Report CR-135396, (19780000), URL: https://ntrs.nasa.gov/archive/nasa/casi.ntrs.nasa.gov/19790003913.pdf, XP055280688
    - Gray D E; Gardner W B, "Energy Efficient Engine Program, Technology Benefit/Cost Study", NASA Technical Report CR-174766, vol. II, (19830000), URL: https://ntrs.nasa.gov/archive/nasa/casi.ntrs.nasa.gov/19900019249.pdf, XP009502192