Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800407

EP2800407 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING APPLICATION DETECTION CONTROL FUNCTION MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2018/34]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Jinhua
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / ZHOU, Xiaoyun
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Gevers Patents
Intellectual Property House
Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[2018/34]
Former [2014/45]Windal-Vercasson, Gaelle I.M.
CABINET VIDON
Technopôle Atalante
16B Rue de Jouanet - BP
35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR
Application number, filing date13743924.622.01.2013
[2018/34]
WO2013CN70852
Priority number, dateCN2012102106930.01.2012         Original published format: CN201210021069
[2014/45]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113263
Date:08.08.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800407
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800407
Date:22.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/24, H04W24/10, H04W76/00, H04L12/14
[2018/21]
Former International [2014/45]H04W4/24, H04W24/10, H04W76/02, H04L12/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES ANWENDUNGSERKENNUNGSSTEUERFUNKTIONSMODUS[2014/45]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING APPLICATION DETECTION CONTROL FUNCTION MODE[2014/45]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION DE MODE FONCTION DE COMMANDE DE DÉTECTION D'APPLICATION[2014/45]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014Translation filed 
30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Search fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
15.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2018Fee for grant paid
13.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.05.2018
Opposition(s)23.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
MC22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
LU22.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
MC22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
NO22.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NO22.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT22.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Policy and Charging Control (PCC) over S9 reference point; Stage 3 (Release 11)", 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT_29215-B30_RM, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111214), XP050557341 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [4.5.3.10] * * paragraph [5.4.1] *
 [XP]  - ZTE, "Capability negotiation of solicited and unsolicted reporting mode in the roaming case (R11 29.215)", 3GPP DRAFT; C3-120202_CAPABILITY NEGOTIATION OF SOLICITED AND UNSOLICTED REPORTING MODE IN THE ROAMING CASE (R11 29.215), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ;, (20120130), vol. CT WG3, no. Xiamen, China; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050579893 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[XP]CN102655634  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]CN102111740  (ZTE CORP);
 [A]CN101867977  (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD);
 [XP]  - "Capability negotiation of solicited and unsolicted reporting mode in the roaming case (R11 29.215)", 3GPP TSG-CT WG3 MEETING #68, (20120210), pages 3 - 6, XP050579893
 [A]  - "Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Policy and charging control architecture (Release 11)", 3GPP TS 23.203 V11.4.0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, (20111231), XP050575094
 [A]  - "Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Policy and charging control (PCC) over S9 reference point (Release 11)", 3GPP TS 29.215 V11.3.0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, (20111219), XP050557341