Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810715

EP2810715 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FLUORINATED ION EXCHANGE RESIN FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/50]METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLUORINATED ION EXCHANGE RESIN SOLUTION
[2017/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Glass Company, Limited
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / WAKABAYASHI, Hirokazu
c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited
5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
02 / HOMMURA, Satoru
c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited
5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
03 / SAEKI, Takashi
c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited
5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
04 / SHIMOHIRA, Tetsuji
c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited
5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/02]
Former [2014/50]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date13744125.924.01.2013
[2017/02]
WO2013JP51511
Priority number, dateJP2012001900531.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012019005
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115072
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810715
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810715
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01J39/20, B01J47/12, C08J5/22, H01B13/00, H01M8/02, H01M8/10, H01M4/86, H01M8/1023, H01M8/1039, H01M8/1072
[2016/26]
Former International [2015/41]B01J39/20, B01J47/12, C08J5/22, H01B13/00, H01M8/02, H01M8/10, H01M4/86
Former International [2014/50]B01J39/20, B01J47/12, C08J5/22, H01B13/00, H01M8/02, H01M8/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLUORIERTEN IONENAUSTAUSCHHARZFLÜSSIGKEIT[2017/02]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FLUORINATED ION EXCHANGE RESIN FLUID[2017/02]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN FLUIDE DE RÉSINE ÉCHANGEUSE D'IONS FLUORÉE[2017/02]
Former [2014/50]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLUORIERTEN IONENAUSTAUSCHHARZLÖSUNG
Former [2014/50]METHOD FOR PRODUCING FLUORINATED ION EXCHANGE RESIN SOLUTION
Former [2014/50]PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE SOLUTION DE RÉSINE ÉCHANGEUSE D'IONS FLUORÉE
Entry into regional phase20.05.2014Translation filed 
22.05.2014National basic fee paid 
22.05.2014Search fee paid 
22.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
18.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2016Fee for grant paid
17.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2016
Opposition(s)12.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.01.2013
AT11.01.2017
CY11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU24.01.2013
AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
MT24.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2018/13]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
IE24.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
LU24.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/37]AT11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
NL11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
BE31.01.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007141427  (HOMMURA SATORU [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0028] , [0047] - [0126]; examples 1-20 *;
 [A]US2002064700  (HIGUCHI YOSHIAKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2006019097  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2006131846  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010018674  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2004102714  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2005096422  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2008050692  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2008090990  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]WO2009116630  (ASAHI GLASS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2006299092  (ASAHI KASEI CORP.);
 [A]JP2002324557  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.);
 [A]JP2011018530  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.)
by applicantJP2007173109
 JP2009140667
 US4358412
 WO2007013533
 JP2010095470
 WO03037885
 JP2005314388
 JP2009040909
 JP2006152249
 JP2006241302
 JP2012019005
    - D.J.VAUGHAM, DU PONT INOVATION, vol. 43, no. 3,1973, page 10