EP2809186 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altria Client Services LLC 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, Virginia 23230 / US | For all designated states Li, San 1313 Goswick Ridge Road Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | For all designated states Karles, George 4025 Huntsteed Way Richmond, Virginia 23233 / US | For all designated states Mishra, Munmaya K. 1631 Sabot Creek Drive Manakin Sabot, Virginia 23103 / US | For all designated states Kobal, Gerd 3124 Rock Cress Lane Sandy Hook, Virginia 23153 / US | For all designated states Oliveri, Douglas 6126 Autumn Bluff Road Powhatan, Virginia 23139 / US | For all designated states Bajec, Martha 3432 Stuart Avenue Richmond, Virginia 23221 / US | For all designated states Flora, Jason 8139 Grimsby Road Richmond, Virginia 23235 / US | [2017/29] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Altria Client Services Inc. 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, VA 23230 / US | ||
For all designated states Li, San 1313 Goswick Ridge Road Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | |||
For all designated states Karles, George 4025 Huntsteed Way Richmond, Virginia 23233 / US | |||
For all designated states Mishra, Munmaya K. 1631 Sabot Creek Drive Manakin Sabot, Virginia 23103 / US | |||
For all designated states Kobal, Gerd 3124 Rock Cress Lane Sandy Hook, Virginia 23153 / US | |||
For all designated states Oliveri, Douglas 6126 Autumn Bluff Road Powhatan, Virginia 23139 / US | |||
For all designated states Bajec, Martha 3432 Stuart Avenue Richmond, Virginia 23221 / US | |||
For all designated states Flora, Jason 8139 Grimsby Road Richmond, Virginia 23235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, San 1313 Goswick Ridge Road Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | 02 /
KARLES, George 4025 Huntsteed Way Richmond, Virginia 23233 / US | 03 /
MISHRA, Munmaya K. 1631 Sabot Creek Drive Manakin Sabot, Virginia 23103 / US | 04 /
KOBAL, Gerd 3124 Rock Cress Lane Sandy Hook, Virginia 23153 / US | 05 /
OLIVERI, Douglas 6126 Autumn Bluff Road Powhatan, Virginia 23139 / US | 06 /
BAJEC, Martha 7422 Outer Gray Street Newburgh, Indiana 47630 / US | 07 /
FLORA, Jason 8139 Grimsby Road Richmond, Virginia 23235 / US | 08 /
TUCKER, Christoper S. 11718 Explorer Terrace Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | 09 /
JORDAN, Geoffrey Brandon 8036 Kentucky Derby Drive Midlothian, Virginia 23112 / US | 10 /
SMITH, Barry S. 9751 James Crest Drive Hopewell, Virginia 23860 / US | 11 /
ROSTAMI, Ali A. 12032 Stonewick Place Glen Allen, Virginia 23059 / US | 12 /
MARCQ, Pauline 33 W Lock Lane 1 Richmond, Virginia 23226 / US | [2017/48] |
Former [2014/50] | 01 /
LI, San 1313 Goswick Ridge Road Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | ||
02 /
KARLES, George 4025 Huntsteed Way Richmond, Virginia 23233 / US | |||
03 /
MISHRA, Munmaya K. 1631 Sabot Creek Drive Manakin Sabot, Virginia 23103 / US | |||
04 /
KOBAL, Gerd 3124 Rock Cress Lane Sandy Hook, Virginia 23153 / US | |||
05 /
OLIVERI, Douglas 6126 Autumn Bluff Road Powhatan, Virginia 23139 / US | |||
06 /
BAJEC, Martha 3432 Stuart Avenue Richmond, Virginia 23221 / US | |||
07 /
FLORA, Jason 8139 Grimsby Road Richmond, Virginia 23235 / US | |||
08 /
TUCKER, Christoper S. 11718 Explorer Terrace Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | |||
09 /
JORDAN, Geoffrey Brandon 8036 Kentucky Derby Drive Midlothian, Virginia 23112 / US | |||
10 /
SMITH, Barry S. 9751 James Crest Drive Hopewell, Virginia 23860 / US | |||
11 /
ROSTAMI, Ali A. 12032 Stonewick Place Glen Allen, Virginia 23059 / US | |||
12 /
MARCQ, Pauline 33 W Lock Lane 1 Richmond, Virginia 23226 / US | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13744143.2 | 31.01.2013 | [2017/14] | WO2013US24211 | Priority number, date | US201261593004P | 31.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261593004 P | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013116558 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2809186 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2809186 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A61M15/06 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A24F47/00 (IL);
A24F7/00 (IL,RU);
A24F40/46 (IL,KR);
A61M11/042 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A24B15/167 (KR);
A24B15/186 (KR);
A24B15/243 (KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24F40/40 (IL,US);
A24F40/44 (IL,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A24F40/70 (IL,US);
A61M11/001 (IL,US);
A61M11/003 (IL,US);
A61M11/04 (IL,US);
A61M15/002 (EP,CN,IL,US);
H01C17/00 (IL,US);
H05B1/0244 (IL,US);
H05B3/0014 (IL,US);
H05B3/10 (IL,US);
H05B3/12 (IL,US);
H05B3/16 (IL,US);
H05B3/42 (IL,US);
H05B3/44 (IL,US);
A61M2016/0018 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61M2016/0024 (KR);
A61M2021/0016 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,IL,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M2205/8268 (IL,US);
A61M2209/02 (EP,CN,IL,US);
F04C2270/0421 (EP,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/50] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE | [2014/50] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE | [2014/50] | French: | CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 04.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE JT International S.A. 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
16.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE JT International S.A. 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2018/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.2018
JT International S.A. 8 rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH Opponent's representative Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 19.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.05.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.11.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | Appeal following opposition | 27.12.2019 | Appeal received No. T0121/20 | 13.03.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 11.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2013 | AL | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | CH | 31.01.2018 | IE | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | MT | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 31.01.2013 | |
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 31.01.2013 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
MT | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 05.04.2017 | |
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006191546 (TAKANO SHUSEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007267032 (SHAN YANSONG [US]) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, paragraphs 57-58; figures 1,2,3A-3C *; | [A]US2009126745 (HON LIK [CN]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010083959 (SILLER FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 1-28 * page 5, paragraph 57 - page 6, paragraph 74; figures 1a-3c *; | [YA]EP2260733 (XIU YUNQIANG [CN]) [Y] 4-21,24,25,27,28 * column 7, line 17 - column 9, line 39; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,26; | [A]US7878962 (KARLES GEORGIOS D [US], et al) [A] 4-21,24,25,27,28 * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 39 *; | [XYI]CN201860753U (SHENZHEN SHIMEITE SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,22,23 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-21,24,25,27,28 [I] 26; | [A]US2011232654 (MASS BERNARD KAREL [BE]) [A] 1-28* abstract * | International search | [A]US2006191546 (TAKANO SHUSEI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2007267032 (SHAN YANSONG [US]); | [A]US2009126745 (HON LIK [CN]); | [A]US2010083959 (SILLER FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [Y]US7878962 (KARLES GEORGIOS D [US], et al); | [X]CN201860753U (SHENZHEN SHIMEITE SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]US2011232654 (MASS BERNARD KAREL [BE]) | Opposition | DE3218760 | DE3148335 | US4961438 | DE19630619 | DE19654945 | EP0845220 | US2006191546 | JP2006320287 | US2007267032 | US2009126745 | JP2009148233 | US2010083959 | WO2010045670 | WO2010045671 | JP2010104310 | US7726320 | EP2260733 | US7878962 | CN201860753U | US2011232654 | CN102266125 | CN202122097U | US2012145169 |