Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811790

EP2811790 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHANNEL ACCESS VIA NULL DATA PACKET FRAME IN WIRELESS LAN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, SM
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / SEOK, Yongho
LG Institute
533 Hogye 1(il)-dong
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/14]
Former [2014/50]Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13744165.505.02.2013
[2018/14]
WO2013KR00913
Priority number, dateUS201261595124P05.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261595124 P
US201261598833P14.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261598833 P
US201261661368P19.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261661368 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115629
Date:08.08.2013
Language:KO
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811790
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811790
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H04W74/08, // H04W74/00, H04W84/12
[2015/39]
Former International [2014/50]H04W52/02, H04W74/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR KANALZUGRIFF ÜBER NULLDATENPAKETRAHMEN IN EINEM WLAN-SYSTEM[2014/50]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHANNEL ACCESS VIA NULL DATA PACKET FRAME IN WIRELESS LAN SYSTEM[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT L'ACCÈS AU CANAL AU MOYEN D'UNE TRAME DE PAQUET DE DONNÉES VIDE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU LOCAL SANS FIL[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2014Translation filed 
22.08.2014National basic fee paid 
22.08.2014Search fee paid 
22.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
12.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2017Fee for grant paid
01.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.08.2017
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
[2019/11]
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[IA]CA2782730  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1-5,8-13 * page 36, lines 13-20 * * page 8, lines 15-22 * * page 29, lines 7-11 * * page 12, lines 15-19; figures 3,12,16 * [A] 6,7;
 [A]US2010260138  (LIU YONG [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0128] *
International search[A]US2012026909  (SEOK YONG HO [KR])
 [X]  - ELDAD, PERAHIA., "Gigabit wireless LANs: an overview of IEEE 802.11 ac and 802.11 ad.", ACM SIGMOBILE MOBILE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS REVIEW ARCHIVE, (201107), vol. 15, no. IS.3, XP055015658

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2073290.2073294