EP2809179 - LOW CALORIE DRINK TABLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Ave East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTZ, Hayley 400 W. 55th Street 3P New York, NY 10019 / US | 02 /
COBOS, Maria 29 Quintard Drive Port Chester, NY 10573 / US | 03 /
LEIS, Paul 8985 Wintergreen Drive West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13744206.7 | 25.01.2013 | WO2013US23241 | Priority number, date | US201261593672P | 01.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261593672 P | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013116112 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2809179 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/40 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
A23L2/40 (EP,US);
A23L2/395 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Title | German: | KALORIENARME GETRÄNKETABLETTE | [2014/50] | English: | LOW CALORIE DRINK TABLET | [2014/50] | French: | COMPRIMÉ POUR BOISSON HYPOCALORIQUE | [2014/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 05.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN101933909 ; | [XI]CN101455694 ; | [XI]CN101669642 ; | [XI]CN101455337 ; | [X]CN101317976 ; | [XI]WO2007137218 (AMERILAB TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,12 * examples 1-4; claims 1-20 * [I] 1-12; | [XI]WO2011133911 (AMERILAB TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,12 * claims 1-8 *[I] 1-12; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 27, Database accession no. 2011-B62154, XP002745469 & CN101933909 A 20110105 (HENAN KANGXING PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,12 * abstract * [I] 1-12 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 45, Database accession no. 2009-K84273, XP002745470 & CN101455694 A 20090617 (LIU H) [X] 1,3,9,12 * abstract * [I] 1-12 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 29, Database accession no. 2010-D58553, XP002745471 & CN101669642 A 20100317 (SHANGHAI INST TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1,12 * abstract * [I] 1-12 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 43, Database accession no. 2009-K84522, XP002745472 & CN101455337 A 20090617 (LIU H) [X] 1,3,4,12 * abstract * [I] 1-12 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 18, Database accession no. 2009-B47846, XP002745473 & CN101317976 A 20081210 (WANG Y) [X] 1,12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5853785 (NAYYAR DALIP K [US], et al); | [Y]US5855948 (MILLS PETER TEMPELE JOHN [ZA], et al); | [Y]US2010112158 (ABELYAN VARUZHAN [MY], et al); | [Y]US8053007 (INNOCENZI MARK [US]); | [X]US2011281008 (GOOTENILLEKE LAKNATH ANSLEM [US], et al) | by applicant | US5853785 | US5855948 | WO2007137218 | CN101317976 | CN101455694 | CN101455337 | CN101669642 | US2010112158 | CN101933909 | WO2011133911 | US8053007 | US2011281008 |