Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810416

EP2810416 - LATENCY-BASED ROUTING AND LOAD BALANCING IN A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK, SM
published on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
1701 JFK Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / PATTERSON, Katherine, E.
78 Boothby Drive
Mount Laurel, NJ 08054 / US
02 / BEENHAM, Nicholas, C.
42 Bennett Court
Swedesboro, NJ 08085 / US
03 / ELAMTHURUTHY, Joy, Mathew
6 High Woods Avenue
Sicklerville, NJ 08081 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/29]
Former [2014/50]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13744208.306.02.2013
[2018/29]
WO2013IB00150
Priority number, dateUS20121336399601.02.2012         Original published format: US201213363996
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013114198
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810416
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810416
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/52, H04L29/06
[2015/46]
Former International [2014/50]H04L25/52
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LATENZBASIERTES ROUTING UND LASTAUSGLEICH IN EINEM NETZWERK[2014/50]
English:LATENCY-BASED ROUTING AND LOAD BALANCING IN A NETWORK[2014/50]
French:ACHEMINEMENT ET ÉQUILIBRAGE DES LIGNES BASÉS SUR LA LATENCE DANS UN RÉSEAU[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Search fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
04.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2018Fee for grant paid
07.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2018
Opposition(s)23.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/23]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
NO18.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2001039586  (PRIMAK LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0025] , [0030] , [0032] - [0046] - [0050] - [0055] - [0058] *;
 [A]US2002143798  (LISIECKI PHILIP A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0037] - [0039] *
International search[X]US5982828  (FUJIMORI JUNICHI [JP], et al);
 [Y]US2008010296  (BAYLISS DAVID [US], et al);
 [Y]US2002165934  (CONRAD JEFFREY RICHARD [US], et al);
 [Y]US7401120  (WALBECK ALAN K [US], et al);
 [Y]US5774660  (BRENDEL JUERGEN [US], et al)
by applicantUS2001039586