Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811375

EP2811375 - TACTILE-FEEL PRESENTATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRESENTING TACTILE FEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[2017/10]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006 Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HIROSE, Yoshifumi
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center, IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / ARAKI, Shoichi
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center, IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / NAGAHARA, Hidetomo
c/o Panasonic Corporation
Intellectual Property Center, IP Development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13744364.416.01.2013
[2017/10]
WO2013JP00144
Priority number, dateJP2012001663230.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012016632
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013114793
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811375
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811375
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041, G06F3/01, B06B1/02
[2015/12]
Former International [2014/50]G06F3/041, G06F3/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR DARSTELLUNG EINES TASTGEFÜHLS UND VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG EINES TASTGEFÜHLS[2014/50]
English:TACTILE-FEEL PRESENTATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRESENTING TACTILE FEEL[2014/50]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ VISANT À OFFRIR UNE SENSATION TACTILE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2013Translation filed 
01.09.2014National basic fee paid 
01.09.2014Search fee paid 
01.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
04.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2016Fee for grant paid
19.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.08.2016
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
MC08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/14]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
IT08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SI08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
DK08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
SM08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
PT10.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
PL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT08.03.2017
CZ08.03.2017
EE08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RO08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
SK08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
IS08.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ08.03.2017
ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES08.03.2017
FI08.03.2017
HR08.03.2017
LT08.03.2017
LV08.03.2017
NL08.03.2017
RS08.03.2017
SE08.03.2017
BG08.06.2017
NO08.06.2017
GR09.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2010141408  (DOY ANTHONY STEPHEN [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009]; figure 8 *;
 [Y]JP2006079238  (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2008130055  (SONY CORP.);
 [A]JP2006079238  (ALPINE ELECTRONICS, INC.);
 [A]JPH0990867  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2008130055
 JP2011501296