Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2811050


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.02.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.08.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.04.2018 First examination report
02.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
03.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2015 Change - classification published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
04.09.2015 Change - classification published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
04.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
05.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
05.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
19.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
31.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication