Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2811050 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380004706 EP13744378



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9572252Global Dossier 14.02.2017B2
US2014332259 13.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012017261 30.01.2012
WO2013JP52059 30.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140119693Global Dossier 10.10.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012017261 30.01.2012
WO2013JP52059 30.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104024473BGlobal Dossier 28.09.2016B
CN104024473 03.09.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2012017261 30.01.2012
WO2013JP52059 30.01.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2811050Global Dossier 07.10.2015A4
EP2811050 10.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2012017261 30.01.2012
WO2013JP52059 30.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013115256Global Dossier 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
JP2012017261 30.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6061369BGlobal Dossier 18.01.2017B2
JP2013155410 15.08.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012017261 30.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI554164B 11.10.2016B
TW201347624 16.11.2013A
Priority number Date
JP2012017261 30.01.2012