Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811050

EP2811050 - WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toppan Printing Co., Ltd.
5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
For all designated states
National University Corporation Gunma University
2 Aramaki-machi 4-chome
Maebashi-shi, Gunma 371-8510 / JP
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / TSUCHIDA Tetsuyuki
c/o Toppan Printing Co. Ltd.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
02 / OKUBO Toshikazu
c/o Toppan Printing Co. Ltd.
5-1 Taito 1-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-8560 / JP
03 / SHOHJI Ikuo
c/o National University Corporation
Gunma University
5-1 Tenjin-cho 1-chome
Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8515 / JP
04 / KANO Takahiro
c/o National University Corporation
Gunma University
5-1 Tenjin-cho 1-chome
Kiryu-shi Gunma 376-8515 / JP
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13744378.430.01.2013
WO2013JP52059
Priority number, dateJP2012001726130.01.2012         Original published format: JP 2012017261
[2014/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115256
Date:08.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811050
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C23C18/36, C23C18/44, H05K1/09, H05K3/24, C23C18/16, C23C18/50
[2015/41]
Former International [2014/50]C23C18/36, C23C18/44, H05K1/09
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:LEITERPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER LEITERPLATTE[2014/50]
English:WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING WIRING BOARD[2014/50]
French:CARTE DE CÂBLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE DE CÂBLAGE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2014Translation filed 
30.07.2014National basic fee paid 
30.07.2014Search fee paid 
30.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
01.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010155108  (LEE CHUL MIN [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0147] *;
 [I]US2008277140  (KUROSAKA SEIGO [JP] ET AL) [I] 3,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0016]; examples 1-4; table 1 *;
 [A]JP2005082883  (OKUNO CHEM IND CO) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006]; examples 7,8 * * paragraph [0008] *;
 [A]US2004007472  (HOLLANDER ALFONS [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0016]; example 1; table 1 *
International search[A]WO2007010760  (NIPPON MINING & METALS CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2000124571  (JAPAN PURE CHEMICAL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2000124571