EP2871951 - FILTRATION IN ORGAN PERFUSION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifeline Scientific, Inc. One Pierce Place, Suite 475W Itasca, IL 60143 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Lifeline Scientific, Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca IL 60143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINMAN, Christopher P. c/o LIFELINE SCIENTIFIC INC. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | 02 /
LOUIS, Jeffrey S. c/o LIFELINE SCIENTIFIC INC. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13744868.4 | 08.07.2013 | [2021/13] | WO2013US49590 | Priority number, date | US201213545598 | 10.07.2012 Original published format: US201213545598 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014011560 | Date: | 16.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2871951 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2871951 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
A01N1/0247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTRIERUNG IN EINER ORGANPERFUSIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/21] | English: | FILTRATION IN ORGAN PERFUSION APPARATUS | [2015/21] | French: | FILTRATION DANS UN APPAREIL DE PERFUSION D'ORGANE | [2015/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2013 | AL | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | IE | 08.07.2021 | LU | 08.07.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2023/36] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 08.07.2013 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 08.07.2013 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | CZ | 31.03.2021 | |
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | CZ | 31.03.2021 | |
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 31.03.2021 | |
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 31.03.2021 | |
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 31.03.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3995444 (CLARK ROBERT A, et al) [X] 1,3,7 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2004089235 (ORGAN RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,27,33 * paragraph [0073]; figure - *[I] 2,4-7,34,35; | [XI]US2005147958 (HASSANEIN WALEED [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9-17,20-22,24,31-33 * paragraphs [0102] - [0112]; figure 5 * [I] 2-4,7,8,18,19,23,25-30,34,35; | [XDI]US7824848 (OWEN DONALD R [US], et al) [XD] 1,3,6,9-11,13-18,20,21,31-33 * column 9, lines 49-61 * * column 12, lines 19-34 * * column 13, lines 55-61 * * column 17, lines 55-65 * * column 18, lines 38-45 * * column 19, lines 23-27 * * column 20, line 49 - column 21, line 38; figure 2 * * column 33, lines 1-7 * * claims 22-23 * [I] 7,19,23,27-30,34,35; | [XI]US2011076666 (BRASSIL JOHN [US]) [X] 1,4-7,33 * paragraphs [0034] - [0045] - [0056]; figure -; claims 1, 7-9 * [I] 8,27; | [X]WO2011037512 (VIVOLINE MEDICAL AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,6,27,33,34 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 2; figures 1-3 *; | [X] - Anonymous, "LifePort Kidney Transporter - Operator's Manual (Organ Recovery Systems)", (20070721), pages 1 - 47, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20070721022154/http://www.organ-recovery.com/pdfs/Kidney_Transporter/LifePort_Operators_Manual.pdf, (20131008), XP055082999 [X] 1,3,6,27,33,34 * pages 2,14,15 * | [X] - Anonymous, "LifePort Sterile Disposables (Organ Recovery Systems)", (20090509), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20090509191207/http://www.organ-recovery.com/products.php?id=1, (20131008), XP002714487 [X] 27 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7824848 |