Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2879633

EP2879633 - REDUCED-PRESSURE ABSORBENT DRESSING, SYSTEM FOR TREATING A TISSUE SITE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2019New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Former [2017/01]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Former [2015/24]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
Legal Department - Intellectual Property P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LOCKE, Christopher Brian
6 Bosworth Mews
Burnemouth Dorset BH9 3SD / GB
02 / HALL, Colin John
33 Oakdale Road
Poole Dorset BH15 3LD / GB
 [2018/34]
Former [2015/24]01 / LOCKE, Christopher, Brian
6 Bosworth Mews
Burnemouth Dorset BH9 3SD / GB
02 / HALL, Colin, John
33 Oakdale Road
Poole Dorset BH15 3LD / GB
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/34]Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
Former [2015/24]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date13745555.630.07.2013
[2018/34]
WO2013US52733
Priority number, dateUS201261677376P30.07.2012         Original published format: US 201261677376 P
[2015/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014022400
Date:06.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2879633
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014
[2015/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2879633
Date:22.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61M1/00, A61F13/02
[2015/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDES VERBAND ZUR ANWENDUNG MIT REDUZIERTEM DRUCK, SYSTEM ZUM BEHANDELN EINER GEWEBESTELLE, UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DES VERBANDS[2018/10]
English:REDUCED-PRESSURE ABSORBENT DRESSING, SYSTEM FOR TREATING A TISSUE SITE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE DRESSING[2015/24]
French:PANSEMENT ABSORBANT À PRESSION RÉDUITE, SYSTÈME POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN SITE TISSULAIRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU PANSEMENT[2018/10]
Former [2015/24]DRUCKREDUZIERTER SAUGFÄHIGER WUNDVERBAND, SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER GEWEBESTELLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES WUNDVERBANDS
Former [2015/24]PANSEMENT ABSORBANT À PRESSION RÉDUITE, SYSTÈME POUR TRAITER UN SITE TISSULAIRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DU PANSEMENT
Entry into regional phase23.02.2015National basic fee paid 
23.02.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
26.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2018Fee for grant paid
15.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18179671.5  / EP3403624
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.05.2019   
Smith and Nephew, Inc.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
 [2019/26]
06.06.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.10.2019Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SI22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
DK22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
SM22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL22.08.2018
AT22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
EE22.08.2018
ES22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
SK22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL22.08.2018
CZ22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
PL22.08.2018
RO22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
IT22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL22.08.2018
FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
LV22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI22.08.2018
HR22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
RS22.08.2018
SE22.08.2018
BG22.11.2018
NO22.11.2018
GR23.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NL22.08.2018
NO22.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI22.08.2018
LT22.08.2018
NO22.11.2018
IS22.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT22.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2009146441  (KCI LICENSING INC [US]; RANDOLPH LARRY TAB [US]; LONG JUSTIN ALEXANDER) [Y] 1-40 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] , [0021] , [0027] - [0038] - [0041]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5308896  (HANSEN MICHAEL R [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-40 * column 46, line 1 - column 47, line 8; figures 4-7 *
ExaminationUS2010125258
 US2009227969
OppositionWO2009066106
 WO2011049562