EP2897999 - TWO-COMPONENT (2K) LAMINATION ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | For:AL
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NO
PL
RO
RS
SI
SK
SM
Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For:AL
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NO
PL
RO
RS
SI
SK
SM
Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | |||
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Henkel AG&Co. KGAA Henkelstr. 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICHELMANN, Holger Dietrich-Bonhoeffer-Str. 9 40724 Hilden / DE | 02 /
MISIAK, Hanns Dürerstr. 34 42781 Haan / DE | 03 /
HÜBNER, Christina Christ-König-Weg 5 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
HÖLTGEN, Michael Benninghauser Str. 18 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
NEITZKE, Daniela Henkelstr. 6 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2016/51] |
Former [2015/31] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 13745662.0 | 05.08.2013 | [2016/51] | WO2013EP66412 | Priority number, date | DE201210215027 | 23.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012215027 | [2015/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014029606 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2897999 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2897999 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/18, C08G59/56 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C09J177/06 (US);
B32B29/005 (US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C08G59/184 (US);
C08G59/186 (EP,US);
C08G59/54 (US);
C08G59/56 (EP,US);
C09D123/06 (US);
C09D177/06 (US);
C09J123/06 (US);
C09J163/00 (EP,US);
D21H19/24 (EP,US);
D21H27/10 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
B32B2439/70 (EP,US);
B32B2439/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 2-K-KASCHIERKLEBSTOFF | [2015/31] | English: | TWO-COMPONENT (2K) LAMINATION ADHESIVE | [2015/31] | French: | ADHÉSIF POUR STRATIFIÉS À DEUX CONSTITUANTS | [2015/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 12.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2013 | AL | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | MT | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | IE | 05.08.2017 | LU | 05.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 05.08.2013 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.08.2013 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
IE | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2010030629 ; | [AD]EP1219656 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AD] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP1437393 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AD] 1-13 * claim 6 *; | [AD]WO2011000619 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [AD] 1-13* claim 6 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 14, Database accession no. 2010-B75608, XP002725415 & JP2010030629 A 20100212 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |