Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812478

EP2812478 - COLLAPSIBLE DRYING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Groupe FITSYSTEMES Inc.
3855, de Saint-Germain
Trois-Rivières, QC G8Y 6L8 / CA
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / VÉZINA, Jean-François
3855 de St-Germain
Trois-Rivières, Québec G8Y 6L8 / CA
02 / LEBEL, Pierrot
485 27e Rue
St-Georges de Beauce, Québec G5Y 4J7 / CA
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Lavoix
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Tischner, Oliver
Lavoix Munich
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date13746017.605.02.2013
WO2013CA00105
Priority number, dateUS20121337100710.02.2012         Original published format: US201213371007
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116929
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812478
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:D06F58/14, A45C7/00, // A45C5/14, A45C13/03, A45C15/00
[2015/39]
Former International [2014/51]D06F58/14, A45C5/14, A45C7/00, D06F57/08, D06F59/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENKLAPPBARER TROCKNUNGSBEHÄLTER[2014/51]
English:COLLAPSIBLE DRYING CONTAINER[2014/51]
French:RÉCIPIENT DE SÉCHAGE REPLIABLE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2014National basic fee paid 
09.09.2014Search fee paid 
09.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA
09.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
15.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/17]
18.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/17]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2339061  (GROUPE FITSYSTEMES INC [CA]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0061] * * figures 1-9; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5289642  (SLOAN CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - column 2, line 24 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 37 * * figures 1-5; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2001049883  (RYDEN MICHAEL V [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0087] - [0090] - [ 0108]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2007086914  (ANTINOZZI MICHAEL [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0020] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2004068888  (LURIE GLENN [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0080] * * figures 1-10 *
International search[X]US3626602  (GLOWACKI, J.);
 [Y]US2011146098  (VEZINA, J. ET AL.)