Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812704

EP2812704 - MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS SPECIFIC PEPTIDES FOR DETECTION OF INFECTION OR IMMUNIZATION IN NON-HUMAN PRIMATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 08.08.2018  [2018/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intuitive Biosciences Inc.
5500 Nobel Drive
Suite 220
Madison, WI 53711 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / LUKE, Kimberly
3618 Turning Leaf Drive
Madison, WI 53719 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13746026.707.02.2013
WO2013US25072
Priority number, dateUS201261595805P07.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261595805 P
US201261723094P06.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261723094 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119763
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812704
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/563, G01N33/543, G01N33/569
[2015/50]
Former International [2014/51]G01N33/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/563
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:MYCOBAKTERIUMSTUBERKULOSE-SPEZIFISCHE PEPTIDE ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER INFEKTION ODER IMMUNISIERUNG NICHTMENSCHLICHER PRIMATEN[2014/51]
English:MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS SPECIFIC PEPTIDES FOR DETECTION OF INFECTION OR IMMUNIZATION IN NON-HUMAN PRIMATES[2014/51]
French:PEPTIDES SPÉCIFIQUES DU BACILLE DE KOCH POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UNE INFECTION OU D'UNE IMMUNISATION CHEZ DES PRIMATES NON HUMAINS[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase15.08.2014National basic fee paid 
15.08.2014Search fee paid 
15.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
19.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/32]
22.03.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.04.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/32]
Divisional application(s)EP18174627.2
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2006117538  (FUSION ANTIBODIES LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15 * pages 5-6,8,11 * * pages 21,22; claim 17; sequences 7, 8 * [I] 12;
 [XI]WO0198460  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * pages 4-5,8-9; claim 9; sequences 33,35 * * pages 46-54 * [I] 12;
 [XI]WO9709429  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [X] 1-11,13-15 * pages 5,9; sequences 89, 99 * [I] 12;
 [XI]CN101735321  (SHANGHAI RONGSHENG BIOTECH CO, et al) [X] 1,3-8,10,11,13,15 * sequence 3 * [I] 2,9,12,14;
 [XI]CN101477125  (INST OF BASE MEDICINE ACADEMY [CN]) [X] 1,3-8,10,11,13,15 * sequence 4 * [I] 2,9,12,14;
 [XI]WO2011045612  (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15 * pages 26-27; sequences 6,17 * [I] 12;
 [XI]WO2011135369  (SEC DEP FOR ENVIRONMENT FOOD AND RURAL AFFAIRS [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15 * pages 6-8; sequences 2,36 * [I] 12;
 [XPI]WO2012057904  (INFECTIOUS DISEASE RES INST [US], et al) [XP] 1-11,13-15 * pages 3-10; sequences 19,93 * [I] 12;
 [XI]EP1712629  (CORIXA CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-8,10,11,13,15 * page 3; sequence 89 * [I] 2,9,12,14
 [XI]  - KANAUJIA G V ET AL, "Recognition of ESAT-6 sequences by Antibodies in Sera of tuberculous Nonhuman Primates", CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20040101), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1128/CDLI.11.1.222-226.2004, ISSN 1071-412X, pages 222 - 226, XP003009923 [X] 1,3-8,10,11,13,15 * abstract * [I] 2,9,12,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.11.1.222-226.2004
    [] - "CN101735321 machine translation", (20160203), URL: www.epo.org, XP055247119
    [] - "CN101477125 machine translation", (20160203), URL: www.epo.org, XP055247126
International search[A]US2005272104  (CHAN ERR-CHENG [TW], et al);
 [A]US2006057621  (LYASHCHENKO KONSTANTIN [US], et al);
 [A]US2009280140  (LAAL SUMAN [US], et al);
 [A]US2009011426  (MACKINTOSH JAMES A [AU], et al)
 [X]  - KANAUJIA ET AL., "Recognition of ESAT-6 sequences by antibodies in sera of tuberculous nonhuman primates", CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY IMMUNOLOGY, (200401), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 222 - 226, XP003009923

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.11.1.222-226.2004