Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813038

EP2813038 - HANDLING USER PLANE CONGESTION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / VENKATACHALAM, Muthaiah
16620 NW Paddington Dr.
Beaverton Oregon 97006 / US
02 / JAIN, Puneet
203 NE 61st Ter
Hillsboro Oregon 97124 / US
03 / SIOW, Eric
8557 SW 181st Ave.
Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13746057.204.02.2013
WO2013US24646
Priority number, dateUS201261595576P06.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261595576 P
US20121356350831.07.2012         Original published format: US201213563508
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119506
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813038
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/12, H04W28/08, H04W48/00, H04W28/02, H04L12/803
[2016/07]
Former International [2015/42]H04W72/12, H04W28/08, H04W48/00
Former International [2014/51]H04L12/801
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:HANDHABUNG VON ÜBERLASTUNGEN AUF BENUTZEREBENE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ[2014/51]
English:HANDLING USER PLANE CONGESTION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2014/51]
French:GESTION D'ENGORGEMENT DE PLAN D'UTILISATEUR DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2014National basic fee paid 
25.07.2014Search fee paid 
25.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
12.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/06]
27.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2010102127  (CISCO TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9,14,15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0023] , [0024] * * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US2008008091  (YUMOTO KAZUMA [JP], et al) [A] 6,7,10-13 * paragraphs [0030] - [0134] * * claims 1,4 *
 [A]  - HUAWEI, "Solution for congestion situation indication", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-103161_SOLUTION FOR CONGESTION SITUATION INDICATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100629), vol. SA WG2, no. Elbonia; 20100706 - 20100713, XP050630893 [A] 1-9,14,15 * see section 1 *
International search[X]US2011170408  (FURBECK DAVID [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011032819  (SCHLIWA-BERTLING PAUL [SE], et al);
 [Y]US2010195493  (HEDMAN PETER [SE], et al);
 [A]US2011188403  (CALIPPE JOEL R [US], et al);
 [A]US2010318670  (AL-SHALASH MAZIN [US], et al)
by applicantWO2010102127
 US2008008091
    - HUAWEI: 'SOLUTION FOR CONGESTION SITUATION INDICATION