Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813211

EP2813211 - COSMETIC PRODUCT OR SKIN REGENERATION PROMOTER COMPRISING NONHUMAN STEM CELL CULTURE SUPERNATANT AS STARTING MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR ION INTRODUCTION FOR PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.07.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japanic Corporation
26-10 Ogawa 2-chome
Machida-shi
Tokyo 194-0003 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / UEDA, Minoru
7-9, Denenchofu 3-chome
Ohta-ku TOKYO 145-0071 / JP
02 / YAMASHITA, Yasuhiro
c/o JAPANIC CORPORATION
26-10 Ogawa 2-chome
Machida-shi Tokyo 194-0003 / JP
 [2015/03]
Former [2014/51]01 / UEDA, Minoru
Shirakabe-House 313
20 Shirakabe 4-chome
Higashi-ku
Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-0011 / JP
02 / YAMASHITA, Yasuhiro
c/o JAPANIC CORPORATION
26-10 Ogawa 2-chome
Machida-shi Tokyo 194-0003 / JP
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date13746172.908.02.2013
WO2013JP53094
Priority number, dateJP2012002785210.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012027852
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118877
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813211
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/98, A61K8/02, A61K35/28, A61K35/32, A61N1/30, A61P17/00, A61P43/00, A61Q19/08, A61M35/00, A61N1/04, A61N1/32, A61Q7/00, B65D81/32
[2015/44]
Former International [2014/51]A61K8/98, A61K8/02, A61K35/28, A61K35/32, A61N1/30, A61P17/00, A61P43/00, A61Q19/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHES PRODUKT ODER HAUTREGENERATIONSFÖRDERER MIT NICHTMENSCHLICHEM STAMMZELLENKULTURÜBERSTAND ALS AUSGANGSMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR IONENEINFÜHRUNG FÜR PROTEIN[2014/51]
English:COSMETIC PRODUCT OR SKIN REGENERATION PROMOTER COMPRISING NONHUMAN STEM CELL CULTURE SUPERNATANT AS STARTING MATERIAL, AND METHOD FOR ION INTRODUCTION FOR PROTEIN[2014/51]
French:PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE OU AGENT FAVORISANT LA RÉGÉNÉRATION DE LA PEAU COMPRENANT UN SURNAGEANT DE CULTURE DE CELLULES SOUCHES NON HUMAINES COMME MATIÈRE DE DÉPART, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'INTRODUCTION D'IONS POUR DES PROTÉINES[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2014Translation filed 
09.09.2014National basic fee paid 
09.09.2014Search fee paid 
09.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
28.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XDY]WO2011118795  (UNIV NAGOYA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al) [XD] 1-4 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0110] * [Y] 5-12;
 [Y]US4103772  (WIEGNER GEORG) [Y] 5-7 * column 1, line 4 - line 21 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 37 * * column 3, line 52 - line 60; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2007185431  (KERN DALE G [US]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0163]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2011177041  (NAKASHIMA MISAKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0143] *
 [Y]  - ZHENG, Y., LIU, Y., ZHANG, C.M., ZHANG, H.Y., LI, W.H., SHI, S., LE, A.D., WANG, S.L., "Stem Cells from Deciduous Tooth Repair Mandibular Defect in Swine", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH, (200903), vol. 88, no. 3, pages 249 - 254, XP002744473 [Y] 10-12 * page 249, column 2, line 33 - page 250, column 1, line 2 * * page 250, column 2, line 24 - line 38 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0022034509333804
International search[Y]WO2011118795  (UNIV NAGOYA NAT UNIV CORP [JP], et al);
 [Y]KR20090059991  (SHINHAN BANK [KR]);
 [Y]JP2009524425  (PROSTEMICS CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2010006734  (PARS CO LTD, et al);
 [Y]JPH05506165  (ALZA CORP.);
 [Y]JP2005270651  (OREAL);
 [Y]JP2003019214  (SUNSORIT KK)
 [Y]  - MINORU UEDA ET AL., "Cell-Based Cytokine Therapy for Skin Rejuvenation", JOURNAL OF CRANIOFACIAL SURGERY, (201011), vol. 21, no. 6, pages 1861 - 1866, XP055161481

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/SCS.0b013e3181f43f0a
 [Y]  - HITOMI MATSUNARI ET AL., "Biomedical application of large animals harboring fluorescent marker genes: characteristics of transgenic-cloned pig with Kusabira-Orange gene", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (20090711), vol. 230, no. 2, pages 147 - 151, XP008174907
by applicantJP2005336188
 WO02086108
 WO2011118795