Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812355

EP2812355 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR USING CSF1R INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / MA, Xiaolei
11720 San Pablo Ave.
Apt 204
El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US
02 / CHEN, Yongmei
C/o Genentech Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
03 / STAWICKI, Scott
C/o Genentech Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
04 / WU, Yan
C/o Genentech Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
05 / MARTIN, Flavius
C/o Genentech Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
06 / LIN, Wei, Yu
C/o Genentech Inc.
1DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
07 / STAROVASNIK, Melissa, A.
C/o Genentech Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Klostermeyer-Rauber, Dörte
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Corporate Law Patents (CLP) Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13746304.806.02.2013
WO2013US24998
Priority number, dateUS201261595658P06.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261595658 P
US201261680674P07.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261680674 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119716
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812355
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/24, A61K39/395, A61P19/02
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON CSF1R-INHIBITOREN[2014/51]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR USING CSF1R INHIBITORS[2014/51]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS DE CSF1R[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2014National basic fee paid 
08.09.2014Search fee paid 
08.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
18.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/13]
20.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.12.2017Request for further processing filed
23.12.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.01.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2011140249  (FIVE PRIME THERAPEUTICS INC; WONG JUSTIN [US]; VASQUEZ MAXIMILIANO [US) [I] 21-30 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] * * example 7 *;
 [I]WO2009112245  (TRANSGENE SA [FR]; HAEGEL HELENE [FR]; THIOUDELLET CHRISTINE [FR]; GEI) [I] 21-30 * paragraph [0152] * * the whole document *
 [IA]  - HAISHAN LIN ET AL, "Discovery of a cytokine and its receptor by functional screening of the extracellular proteome", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, (20080509), vol. 320, no. 5877, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1154370, ISSN 1095-9203, pages 807 - 811, XP002638423 [I] 1-20,25-30 * figure 4B * * abstract * * page 809, column 3, paragraph 4 * [A] 21-24

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1154370
 [A]  - DROIN NATHALIE ET AL, "Editorial: CSF1R, CSF-1, and IL-34, a menage a trois conserved across vertebrates", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, US, (20100501), vol. 87, no. 5, doi:10.1189/JLB.1209780, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 745 - 747, XP009138538 [A] 1-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1189/jlb.1209780
 [A]  - T CHIHARA ET AL, "IL-34 and M-CSF share the receptor Fms but are not identical in biological activity and signal activation", CELL DEATH AND DIFFERENTIATION, (20101201), vol. 17, no. 12, doi:10.1038/cdd.2010.60, ISSN 1350-9047, pages 1917 - 1927, XP055036155 [A] 1-30 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cdd.2010.60
International search[A]US2011243947  (DOODY ET AL);
 [XP]  - MA, X ET AL., "Structural Basis for the Dual Recognition of Helical Cytokines IL-34 and CSF-1 by CSF-1R.", STRUCTURE, (201204), vol. 20, pages 676 - 687, XP055155969

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.str.2012.02.010
 [A]  - CHIHARA. T ET AL., "IL-34 and M-CSF share the receptor Fms but are not identical in biological activity and signal activation.", CELL DEATH AND DIFFERENTIATION, (2010), vol. 17, pages 1917 - 1927, XP055036155

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cdd.2010.60
 [A]  - HWANG. S-J ET AL., "Interleukin-34 produced by human fibroblast-like synovial cells in rheumatoid arthritis supports osteoclastogenesis.", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH & THERAPY, (2012), vol. 14, no. R14, pages 1 - 10, XP021132205

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar3693