Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812785

EP2812785 - VISUAL SPATIAL AUDIO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / VESA, Sampo
Kaarlenkatu 12 A 21
FI-00530 Helsinki / FI
02 / REPONEN, Erika
Tampellan Esplanadi 6 D 15
FI-33100 Tampere / FI
03 / RÄMÖ, Anssi
Velholehdenkatu 9
FI-33720 Tampere / FI
04 / SHENOY, Ravi
94B Nidhi
Ideal Homes Township
Raja Rajeshwari Nagar
Bangalore Karnataka State 560098 / IN
05 / TAMMI, Mikko
Kohmankaari 1 C 13
FI-33310 Tampere / FI
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Smith, Gary John , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date13746345.128.01.2013
WO2013FI50090
Priority number, dateIN2012CHE45007.02.2012         Original published format: IN 450CH2012
[2017/16]
Former [2014/51]IN2012CHE045007.02.2012
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013117806
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2812785
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI03.10.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, H04R29/00, G01S3/00, G06F3/16, H04S7/00, G06F17/14, G10H1/00, G10H1/36
[2015/42]
Former International [2014/51]G06F3/0488, H04R29/00, G01S3/00, G06F3/16, H04S7/00, G06F17/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:VISUELL-RÄUMLICHER KLANG[2014/51]
English:VISUAL SPATIAL AUDIO[2014/51]
French:SIGNAL AUDIO SPATIAL VISUEL[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Search fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
08.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2008025858  (PHONAK AG [CH]; BORETZKI MICHAEL [CH]) [X] 1-11,15 * page 19, line 8 - page 23, line 5 * * page 24, line 7 - page 25, line 14 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 12-14
International search[X]US5812688  (GIBSON DAVID A [US]);
 [X]EP1657961  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]US2011271186  (OWENS JOHN COLIN [US]);
 [A]US2011162513  (MIZUHIKI TAKASHI [JP])
by applicantWO2008025858
 US5812688
 EP1657961