Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812031

EP2812031 - METHOD OF REGULATING CFTR EXPRESSION AND PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Iowa Research Foundation
Iowa Centers for Enterprise
112 N. Capitol Street
6 Gilmore Hall
Iowa City, IA 52242-5500 / US
For all designated states
Integrated Dna Technologies, Inc.
1710 Commercial Park
Coralville, IA 52241 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / MCCRAY, Paul
112 N. Capitol Street
6 Gilmore Hall
Iowa City Iowa 52242-5500 / US
02 / RAMACHANDRAN, Shyam
112 N. Capitol Street
6 Gilmore Hall
Iowa City Iowa 52242-5500 / US
03 / XING, Yi
112 N. Capitol Street
6 Gilmore Hall
Iowa City Iowa 52242-5500 / US
04 / WELSH, Michael
112 N. Capitol Street
6 Gilmore Hall
Iowa City Iowa 52242-5500 / US
05 / BEHLKE, Mark
1710 Commercial Park
Coralville Iowa 52241 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)PATERIS Patentanwälte PartmbB
Altheimer Eck 13
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]PATERIS Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Altheimer Eck 13
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date13746389.906.02.2013
WO2013US24985
Priority number, dateUS201261595493P06.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261595493 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013119705
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2812031
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K48/00, C12N15/113, A61K31/713
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/51]A61K48/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REGULIERUNG EINER CFTR-EXPRESSION UND -VERARBEITUNG[2014/51]
English:METHOD OF REGULATING CFTR EXPRESSION AND PROCESSING[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE L'EXPRESSION DU GÈNE CFTR ET MATURATION MOLÉCULAIRE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2014National basic fee paid 
05.09.2014Search fee paid 
05.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
28.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/45]
29.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011201544  (MADDEN DEAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,12-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010151640  (UNIV NEBRASKA [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 21-23 * * the whole document * * page 5, line 4 - line 9 *;
 [X]  - ROBERT R. ET AL., "Structural analog of Sildenafil identified as a novel corrector of the F508del-CFTR trafficking defect", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, US, vol. 73, no. 2, doi:10.1124/MOL.107.040725, ISSN 0026-895X, (20080201), pages 478 - 489, (20071101), XP008125963 [X] 1-5,9,12-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/MOL.107.040725
 [X]  - KEREM E. ET AL., "Effectiveness of PTC124 treatment of cystic fibrosis caused by nonsense mutations: a prospective phase II trial", THE LANCET, THE LANCET PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 372, no. 9640, doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(08)61168-X, ISSN 0140-6736, (20080830), pages 719 - 727, (20080828), XP024520939 [X] 1-5,9,12-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(08)61168-X
 [X]  - COLLAWN JAMES F. ET AL., "Targets for cystic fibrosis therapy: proteomic analysis and correction of mutant cystic fibrosis transmembrane conductance regulator", EXPERT REVIEW OF PROTEOMICS, FUTURE DRUGS LTD., LONDON, GB, (20100801), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1586/EPR.10.45, ISSN 1478-9450, pages 495 - 506, XP008133940 [X] 1-5,9,12-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/EPR.10.45
 [X]  - VAN GOOR FREDRICK ET AL., "Rescue of DELTAF508-CFTR trafficking and gating in human cystic fibrosis airway primary cultures by small molecules", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY. LUNG CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, US, (20060601), vol. 290, no. 6, doi:10.1152/AJPLUNG.00169.2005, ISSN 1040-0605, pages L1117 - L1130, XP009083597 [X] 1-5,9,12-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajplung.00169.2005
 [XP]  - S. RAMACHANDRAN ET AL., "A microRNA network regulates expression and biosynthesis of wild-type and F508 mutant cystic fibrosis transmembrane conductance regulator", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (20120801), vol. 109, no. 33, doi:10.1073/pnas.1210906109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13362 - 13367, XP055214517 [XP] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1210906109
 [A]  - WENMING XU ET AL., "MicroRNAs and cystic fibrosis - an epigenetic perspective", CELL BIOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (20110330), vol. 35, no. 5, doi:10.1042/CBI20100664, ISSN 1065-6995, pages 463 - 466, XP055214521 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/CBI20100664
 [A]  - ROWE STEVEN M. AND CLANCY JOHN P., "Advances in cystic fibrosis therapies", CURRENT OPINION IN PEDIATRICS, (200612), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 1040-8703, pages 604 - 613, XP008177549 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MOP.0b013e3280109b90
International search[X]US2006188972  (WOLFFE ALAN P [US]);
 [Y]US2011035819  (COOPER MARK J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011201544  (MADDEN DEAN [US], et al);
 [Y]US2011217339  (MORTON DAVID [GB], et al);
 [Y]  - VAN GOOR ET AL., "Rescue of delta 508-CFTR trafficking and gating in human cystic fibrosis airway primary cultures by small molecules.", AM J PHYSIOL LUNG CELL MOL PHYSIOL, (200606), vol. 290, pages L1117 - L1130, XP009083597

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajplung.00169.2005
 [Y]  - LANE ET AL., "Therapeutic siRNA delivery for cystic fibrosis.", HNJM ENGINEERING FIRM, (2009), pages 1 - 38, URL: http://terpconnect.umd.edu/~jpan/samples/cystic-fibrosis.pdf, XP008176417