blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2812031


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.10.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
28.06.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
06.04.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
30.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.09.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.04.2017 First examination report
01.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
01.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2015 Supplementary search report published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
02.10.2015 Change - classification published on  04.11.2015  [2015/45]
28.08.2015 Change - extension states published on  30.09.2015  [2015/40]
02.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
03.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
24.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication