blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2812031
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015045410Global Dossier 12.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201261595493 06.02.2012
WO2013US24985 06.02.2013
US201314376810 06.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2812031Global Dossier 04.11.2015A4
EP2812031 17.12.2014A2
Priority number Date
US201261595493 06.02.2012
WO2013US24985 06.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013217105B 01.02.2018B2
AU2013217105 25.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201261595493 06.02.2012
WO2013US24985 06.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2864009 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261595493 06.02.2012
WO2013US24985 06.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013119705Global Dossier 23.10.2014A3
WO2013119705 15.08.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201261595493 06.02.2012