Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814246

EP2814246 - CAMERA DEVICE, SERVER DEVICE, IMAGE MONITORING SYSTEM, CONTROL METHOD OF IMAGE MONITORING SYSTEM, AND CONTROL PROGRAM OF IMAGE MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.04.2018  [2018/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006 Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / YOKOMITSU, Sumio
c/o Panasonic corporation
Intellectual property Center
Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / FUJII, Hirofumi
c/o Panasonic corporation
Intellectual property Center
Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / FUJIMATSU, Takeshi
c/o Panasonic corporation
Intellectual property Center
Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / WATANABE, Takeshi
c/o Panasonic corporation
Intellectual property Center
Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
05 / MATSUMOTO, Yuichi
c/o Panasonic corporation
Intellectual property Center
Planning and Management Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13746485.505.02.2013
WO2013JP00624
Priority number, dateJP2012002295306.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012022953
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118491
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814246
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/18, H04Q9/00
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:KAMERAVORRICHTUNG, SERVERVORRICHTUNG, BILDÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM, STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR DAS BILDÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND STEUERPROGRAMM FÜR DAS BILDÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM[2014/51]
English:CAMERA DEVICE, SERVER DEVICE, IMAGE MONITORING SYSTEM, CONTROL METHOD OF IMAGE MONITORING SYSTEM, AND CONTROL PROGRAM OF IMAGE MONITORING SYSTEM[2014/51]
French:DISPOSITIF FORMANT CAMÉRA, DISPOSITIF SERVEUR, SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'IMAGE ET PROGRAMME DE CONTRÔLE DE SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'IMAGE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014Translation filed 
08.09.2014National basic fee paid 
08.09.2014Search fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
17.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/15]
01.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/15]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]JP2010136221  (BANKUTEKKU JAPAN KK) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1,4,5 * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0100] *;
 [A]WO03034361  (BIODENTITY SYSTEMS CORP [CA]; VAN BEEK GARY A [CA]; ADLER ANDREW JAMES) [A] 1,8,9,16 * abstract * * page 19, line 1 - line 19 *;
 [A]JP2005323046  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2010068452  (SECOM CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010136221  (BANCTEC JAPAN, INC.);
 [A]JP2004128948  (RICOH CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2003289528
 JP2000333156
 JP2004023794
    - VIOLA-JONES, "algorithm: Rapid Object Detection using a Boosted Cascade of Simple Features", PAUL VIOLA, MICHAEL JONES, COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2001. CVPR 2001, vol. 1, pages 511 - 518