Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812786

EP2812786 - VIRTUAL CREATED INPUT OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.11.2016  [2016/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / BLANTS, Lioudmila
Säynävätie 14 B 10
FI-02170 Espoo / FI
02 / ALAKARHU, Juha
Aleksis Kiven Katu 29 A 24
FI-00520 Helsinki / FI
03 / ITÄRANTA, Janne
Mechelininkatu 12-14 B 50
FI-00100 Helsinki / FI
04 / SAMUELS, John
8 Glebelands
Tarleton Lancashire PR4 6WF / GB
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Berggren Oy, Tampere
Visiokatu 1
33720 Tampere / FI
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date13746532.425.01.2013
WO2013FI50081
Priority number, dateUS20121337060510.02.2012         Original published format: US201213370605
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117803
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812786
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, G06K9/00, G06F3/01, G06F9/44
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:VIRTUELLES ERZEUGTES EINGABEOBJEKT[2014/51]
English:VIRTUAL CREATED INPUT OBJECT[2014/51]
French:OBJET VIRTUEL D'ENTRÉE CRÉÉ[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Search fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
19.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.09.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002141643  (JAEGER DENNY [US]) [X] 1-4,7-14 * paragraphs [0162] - [0167] - [0291] - [0298] - [0337] * * figures 23,36,37 * [I] 5,6,15;
 [XI]US2011267353  (JOHANSSON FREDRIK [SE]) [X] 1,2,10-13 * paragraph [0027] * * figures 2A-E * [I] 3-9,14,15;
 [XI]US2011119624  (COLDEFY FRANCOIS [FR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,10-13 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 1a-e, 3 * [I] 3-9,14,15;
 [XI]US2007180400  (ZOTOV ALEXANDER J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,10-13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042] * * figures 2,3 * [I] 5-9,12-15;
 [A]US2010164877  (YU KUN [CN] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - DANIEL LEITHINGER ET AL, "Improving Menu Interaction for Cluttered Tabletop Setups with User-Drawn Path Menus", HORIZONTAL INTERACTIVE HUMAN-COMPUTER SYSTEMS, 2007. TABLETOP '07. SECOND ANNUAL IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071001), ISBN 978-0-7695-2013-1, pages 121 - 128, XP031161570 [X] 1,2,10-13 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [03.4] * * figures 4-7 * [I] 3-9,14,15
International search[X]US2011041102  (KIM JONG HWAN [KR]);
 [X]US2010083190  (ROBERTS BRIAN [US] ET AL.);
 [X]US2007052685  (WAKAI MASANORI [JP])
 [X]  - LANDAY, J A., "Sketching Interfaces: Toward More Human Interface Design", COMPUTER, vol. 34, (200103), pages 56 - 64, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/xpls/abs_all.jsp?arnumber=910894, (20130704), XP001053843

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.910894
 [X]  - CAETANO, A. ET AL., "JavaSketchIt: Issues in Sketching the Look of User Interfaces", AAAI TECHNICAL REPORT SS-02-08, (2002), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://aaaipress.org/Papers/Symposia/Spring/2002/SS-02-08/SS02-08-002.pdf, (20130704), XP055079007