Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812062

EP2812062 - GUIDE WIRE FOR USE WITH CARDIOVASCULAR LESIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microbot Medical Ltd.
8 Hatochen St.
Caesarea 3079861 / IL
[2019/31]
Former [2018/32]For all designated states
Microbot Medical Ltd.
8 Hatochen St.
Caesarea 3079861 / IL
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Cardiosert Ltd.
P.O.B 387
31 Derech Ha Emmek St.
20600 Yokneam Moshava / IL
Inventor(s)01 / SHEKALIM, Avraham
P.o.b 12067
24 Hashoshanim St.
36842 Nesher / IL
02 / PELEG, Noam
P.o.b. 406
406 Sachlav St.
19351 Gan Ner / IL
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)AWA Denmark A/S
Strandgade 56
1401 Copenhagen K / DK
[2019/31]
Former [2014/51]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13746563.912.02.2013
[2019/31]
WO2013IB51144
Priority number, dateUS201261597783P12.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261597783 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118105
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812062
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812062
Date:31.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/00, A61M25/09, A61B17/22
[2015/40]
Former International [2014/51]A61M25/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FÜHRUNGSDRAHT ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR KARDIOVASKULÄRE LÄSIONEN[2014/51]
English:GUIDE WIRE FOR USE WITH CARDIOVASCULAR LESIONS[2014/51]
French:FIL-GUIDE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ POUR DES LÉSIONS CARDIOVASCULAIRES[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase11.09.2014National basic fee paid 
11.09.2014Search fee paid 
11.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
14.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2019Fee for grant paid
24.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
16.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
25.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201604   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2016
28.02.201705   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2017
28.02.201806   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009312747  (DELANEY KEVIN L [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO03018085  (ARTERIA MEDICAL SCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0081] , [0 82]; figures 6e, 6f *;
 [X]US6113557  (FAGAN JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 6-67; figures 2-5 * * column 5, lines 1-65 *;
 [X]US2010087780  (TEKULVE KURT J [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0029]; figures 2a, 2b, 4, 7 *
International search[X]US7481778  (CEDRO, R ET AL.);
 [Y]US5605162  (MIRZAEE, D ET AL.);
 [Y]US7491224  (COX, DL ET AL.)