Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813280

EP2813280 - HOLLOW FIBER SEMIPERMEABLE MEMBRANE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, MODULE, AND WATER TREATMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyobo Co., Ltd.
2-8 Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8230 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMIZU, Michiko
c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD.
1-1 Katata 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP
02 / YAGI, Toshiyuki
c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD.
1-1 Katata 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP
03 / TOKIMI, Shinobu
c/o TOYOBO CO. LTD.
1-1 Katata 2-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0292 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13746612.408.02.2013
WO2013JP53014
Priority number, dateJP2012002590209.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012025902
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118859
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813280
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01D71/16, B01D69/08, C02F1/44, B01D67/00
[2019/41]
Former International [2015/35]B01D71/16, B01D63/02, B01D69/08, C02F1/44, D01F2/28, B01D67/00
Former International [2014/51]B01D71/16, B01D63/02, B01D69/08, C02F1/44, D01F2/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:SEMIPERMEABLE HOHLFASERMEMBRAN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, MODUL UND WASSERBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN[2014/51]
English:HOLLOW FIBER SEMIPERMEABLE MEMBRANE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, MODULE, AND WATER TREATMENT METHOD[2014/51]
French:MEMBRANE SEMI-PERMÉABLE À FIBRES CREUSES, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, MODULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE L'EAU[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2014Translation filed 
10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Search fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
24.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4980063  (MAHONEY ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * example 4; tables 4a,4b * [I] 4;
 [XI]JP2008132441  (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1,3 * example - * [I] 4;
 [XI]US4371487  (HAMADA KADUTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * examples 1,3; table 1 * [I] 4;
 [A]US4239545  (KURIHARA MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 4 * column 1, line 12 - line 16; example - *
International search[A]JPS5936715  (TOYO BOSEKI);
 [A]JPS5942008  (TOYO BOSEKI);
 [A]WO2010144057  (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG], et al);
 [A]US2006226067  (HERRON JACK [US]);
 [A]JP2000334275  (DAICEL CHEM)
by applicantJPS5936715
 JPH10337448
 JPH0919630
 JP4412486B
 JP4277147B
 JP3591618B
 JP3008886B