Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813583

EP2813583 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING REDUCED IRON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tetsugen Corporation
4-4 Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8142 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / UEKAWA, Seita
c/o TETSUGEN CORPORATION
4-4 Fujimi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8142 / JP
02 / NABEKURA, Kazunori
c/o TETSUGEN CORPORATION
Kimitsu Development Center
1 Kimitsu
Kimitsu-shi Chiba 299-1141 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13746682.705.02.2013
WO2013JP52615
Priority number, dateJP2012002729310.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012027293
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118725
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813583
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:C21B13/08, C22B1/16, C22B1/244, C22B1/248, F27B7/02, F27B7/08, F27B7/10, F27B7/34, F27B7/36
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON REDUZIERTEM EISEN[2014/51]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING REDUCED IRON[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE FER RÉDUIT[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase08.08.2014Translation filed 
03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Search fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
01.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/43]
19.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/43]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4983214  (BOTTINELLI N EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1864593  (TORVALD GUSTAFSSON EMIL GUSTAF) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2648600  (LEWIS REEVE) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3044868  (FRANCIS CHARLES B) [A] 13-23 * figure 1 *
International search[A]JPH06501055  (MANNESMANN AG.);
 [A]JP2002206120  (NIPPON STEEL CORP);
 [A]JP2001019505  (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP);
 [A]JP2010012409  (HIROSHIMA GAS TECHNO KK)
by applicantJPS5110166
 JP2003089823
 JP2010007163
    - G. KOSHIHIRA; Y. AMINAGA; Y. KAWAGUCHI; M. YARIYAMA; A. MIYAMOTO, CAMP ISIJ, (1997), vol. 10, pages 36 - 39
    - "Making New Materials From Slag and Dust and New Developments", 5TH NISHIYAMA COMMEMORATIVE COURSE, (201106), page 94