Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813577

EP2813577 - METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING THE EFFECTS OF ASCORBIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.03.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.04.2017  [2017/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyowa Medex Co., Ltd.
8-10 Harumi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-6004 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / SOYA, Haruyo
c/o Kyowa Medex Research Laboratories
Kyowa Medex Co. Ltd.
600-1 Aza-Kamiyamaji
Minamiishiki, Nagaizumi-cho
Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-0932 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13746840.106.02.2013
WO2013JP52669
Priority number, dateJP2012002621509.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012026215
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118743
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813577
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/28, C12Q1/37
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG DER WIRKUNGEN VON ASCORBINSÄURE[2014/51]
English:METHOD FOR SUPPRESSING THE EFFECTS OF ASCORBIC ACID[2014/51]
French:MÉTHODE DE SUPPRESSION DES EFFETS DE L'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2014Translation filed 
21.08.2014National basic fee paid 
21.08.2014Search fee paid 
21.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
12.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/14]
10.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/14]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1693461  (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP] SEKISUI MEDICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] *;
 [Y]EP1693462  (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0034] , [0035]; claims 1-6 *;
 [Y]EP1726660  (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]  - ARYA S ET AL, "Non-spectrophotometric methods for the determination of Vitamin C", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 417, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2670, (20000717), pages 1 - 14, (20000717), XP027204525 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2009544315  (GENERAL ATOMICS);
 [A]WO03107011  (ARKRAY, INC.);
 [A]JPH0838195  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPH11124373  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPS56151358  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH);
 [AP]WO2012173185  (KYOWA MEDEX CO., LTD.);
 [AP]WO2012020744  (KYOWA MEDEX CO., LTD.)
by applicantJPS5639198
 JPS6441223
 JPS6367139
 JPS6339871
 JPS56151358
 JPH08271504