Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811895

EP2811895 - SENSOR SYSTEM, IMPLANTABLE SENSOR AND METHOD FOR REMOTE SENSING OF A STIMULUS IN VIVO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
02.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IO Surgical, LLC
706 Penney Lane
Schenectady, NY 12303 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / LEDET, Eric, Howard
706 Penney Lane
Schenectady, NY 12303 / US
02 / WACHS, Rebecca, Ann
1 Berncliffe Avenue
Albany, NY 12208 / US
03 / COLE, Keegan, Paul
9 Jefferson Road
Windham, NH 03087 / US
04 / FIORELLA, David
1040 North Quincy Street, Apt. 303
Arlington, VA 22201 / US
 [2015/12]
Former [2014/51]01 / LEDET, Eric, Howard
706 Penney Lane
Schenectady, NY 12303 / US
02 / WACHS, Rebecca, Ann
1 Berncliffe Avenue
Albany, NY 12208 / US
03 / COLE, Keegan, Paul
9 Jefferson Road
Windham, NH 03087 / US
04 / FIORELLA, David
901 North Pollard Street
Arlington, VA 22203 / US
Representative(s)Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Krenkelstraße 3
01309 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Lippert, Stachow & Partner
Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3
01309 Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date13746850.005.02.2013
WO2013US24706
Priority number, dateUS201261633225P07.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261633225 P
US201261688898P24.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261688898 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119528
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811895
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61N1/372
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:SENSORSYSTEM, IMPLANTIERBARER SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR IN-VIVO-FERNMESSUNG EINES REIZES[2014/51]
English:SENSOR SYSTEM, IMPLANTABLE SENSOR AND METHOD FOR REMOTE SENSING OF A STIMULUS IN VIVO[2014/51]
French:SYSTÈME DE CAPTEUR, CAPTEUR IMPLANTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTECTION À DISTANCE D'UN STIMULUS IN VIVO& xA;[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2014National basic fee paid 
05.09.2014Search fee paid 
05.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
15.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
23.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
23.08.2018Request for further processing filed
23.08.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.09.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201806   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2018
28.02.201907   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03061467  (CARDIOMEMS INC [US]; FONSECA MICHAEL [US]; ALLEN MARK [US]; STERN DAVI) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 4-7 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 25 * * page 13, line 11 - page 15, line 25 *;
 [I]WO2009146090  (CARDIOMEMS INC [US]; KROH JASON [US]; CROS FLORENT [US]; COURCIMAULT C) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] , [0038] - [0044] - [0049] - [0051] *
International search[A]WO0112092  (BF GOODRICH COMPANY);
 [A]US2001016683  (DARROW CHRISTOPHER B. ET AL.);
 [A]US2004082867  (ESCH VICTOR C. ET AL.);
 [A]US2011282175  (GEISSLER RANDOLPH K. ET AL.);
 [A]US6939299  (PETERSEN KURT ET AL.)
by applicantWO03061467
 WO2009146090