Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802041

EP2802041 - CONTACT, CONNECTOR, AND CONNECTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Ltd.
21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
[2017/11]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Japan Aviation Electronics Industry, Ltd.
21-2 Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / EBISAWA, Takeshi
c/o Japan Aviation Electronics Industry Limited
21-2 Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-0043 / JP
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
[2017/11]
Former [2014/46]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date13746942.524.01.2013
[2017/11]
WO2013JP51384
Priority number, dateJP2012002692610.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012026926
[2014/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118581
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802041
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2802041
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/15, H01R4/48, H01R13/631, H01R13/11
[2015/47]
Former International [2014/46]H01R13/15, H01R4/48
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONTAKT, VERBINDER UND VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/46]
English:CONTACT, CONNECTOR, AND CONNECTING APPARATUS[2014/46]
French:CONTACT, CONNECTEUR ET APPAREIL DE CONNEXION[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase05.08.2014Translation filed 
05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Search fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
06.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2016Fee for grant paid
30.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.09.2016
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
[2019/30]
Former [2018/14]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
IT15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
SM15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.03.2017
HR15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RS15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
NO15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US4621303  (ROWE NEAL E [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 24 * [A] 2-6,8 [I] 7;
 [A]US3427419  (FINDLEY JOSEPH D JR) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 46; figures 4,5 *
International search[A]JPH02132714  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.);
 [A]JPH10294140  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.);
 [A]JP2009218063  (MITSUTOSHI WATANABE);
 [A]JPS62131333U  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [A]JP2003346956  (THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.);
 [A]JPS63152173U  (CHUBU ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC., FURUKAWA ELECTRIC WORKS CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2009218063