Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812427

EP2812427 - CAPTURED CARBON DIOXIDE FOR ALGACULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carbon Engineering Limited Partnership
15th Floor 850 - 2nd Street SW
Calgary, AB T2P 0R8 / CA
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / KAINTH, Arvinder Pal
186 Royal Oak Gardens NW
Calgary, Alberta T3G 5S5 / CA
02 / HEIDEL, Kenton Robert
112A
3717-50 Street NW
Calgary, Alberta T3A 2V9 / CA
03 / HENDERSON, Matthew Alex
404-A 13th Street NW
Calgary, Alberta T2N 1Z2 / CA
04 / HOLMES, Geoffrey James
504
728 3rd Ave NW
Calgary, Alberta T2N 0J1 / CA
05 / RITCHIE, Jane Anne
485 Tuscany Drive NW
Calgary, Alberta T3L 3C5 / CA
06 / KEITH, David William
716 38th AVE SW
Calgary, Alberta T2T 2H7 / CA
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Sutto, Luca
PGA S.p.A.
Via Mascheroni, 31
20145 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Sutto, Luca
Ponzellini, Gioia e Associati S.r.l. Via Mascheroni, 31
20145 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13746995.308.02.2013
WO2013US25444
Priority number, dateUS201261596983P09.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261596983 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120024
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812427
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search reportKR15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/12, B01J7/00, B01D53/62, C12M1/00
[2015/40]
Former International [2014/51]C12N1/12, B01J7/00, B01D53/62
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:ABGESCHIEDENES KOHLENDIOXID FÜR ALGENKULTUR[2014/51]
English:CAPTURED CARBON DIOXIDE FOR ALGACULTURE[2014/51]
French:DIOXYDE DE CARBONE CAPTURÉ POUR LA CULTURE D'ALGUES[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2014National basic fee paid 
04.09.2014Search fee paid 
04.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
30.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/38]
04.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2011159568  (GEN ATOMICS [US]) [X] 1-3,11-15 * figure 1; claims 1, 21 * [Y] 4-10;
 [XY]US2011011261  (JENNESS BLAIR L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0045]; claims 10,11 * [Y] 4-10;
 [X]WO2009090549  (ALGAE LTD, et al) [X] 1-3,12-15 * page 19, lines 14-27 *;
 [A]US3304151  (GAISER WILLIAM J, et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-8 *
International search[A]WO2008042919  (GLOBAL RES TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al);
 [A]US2011011261  (JENNESS BLAIR L [US], et al)
 [X]  - NEDBAL, LADISLAV ET AL., "Experimental validation of a nonequilibrium model of C02 fluxes between gas, liquid medium, and algae in a flat-panel photobioreactor", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201012), vol. 37, no. 12, pages 1319 - 1326, XP019863065

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10295-010-0876-5
 [A]  - ABD RAHAMAN ET AL., "A review of carbon dioxide capture and utilization by membrane integrated microalgal cultivation processes", RENEWABLE AND SUSTAINABLE ENERGY REVIEW, (201110), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 4002 - 1012, XP055078877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rser.2011.07.031
 [A]  - CHI, ZHANYOU ET AL., "Bicarbonate produced from carbon capture for algae culture", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201111), vol. 29, no. 11, pages 537 - 541, XP028318598

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2011.06.006