Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812454

EP2812454 - A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MELT LAUNDER AND A MELT LAUNDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Outotec (Finland) Oy
Rauhalanpuisto 9
02230 Espoo / FI
[2016/39]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Outotec (Finland) Oy
Puolikkotie 10
02230 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / HUGG, Eero
Kuukausikuja 4 as 19
02200 Espoo / FI
02 / PIENIMÄKI, Kari
Pihlajatie 15 B
02270 Espoo / FI
03 / KETOLA, Mika
Kastevuorenkuja 2 A 3
02360 Espoo / FI
04 / JÅFS, Mikael
Nikunpellonkuja 1 F 11
02920 Espoo / FI
 [2018/18]
Former [2014/51]01 / HUGG, Eero
Kuukausikuja 4 as 19
FI-02200 Espoo / FI
02 / PIENIMÄKI, Kari
Pihlajatie 15 B
FI-02270 Espoo / FI
03 / KETOLA, Mika
Kastevuorenkuja 2 A 3
FI-02360 Espoo / FI
04 / JÅFS, Mikael
Nikunpellonkuja 1 F 11
FI-02920 Espoo / FI
Representative(s)Boco IP Oy Ab
Itämerenkatu 5
00180 Helsinki / FI
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13747073.808.02.2013
[2018/18]
WO2013FI50143
Priority number, dateFI2012000514009.02.2012         Original published format: FI 20125140
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117821
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812454
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812454
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:C21B7/14, F27D3/14, F27D15/00, B23P15/00, F27D15/02
[2015/51]
Former International [2014/51]C21B7/14, F27D3/14, F27D15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GIESSRINNE FÜR SCHMELZE UND GIESSRINNE FÜR SCHMELZE[2014/51]
English:A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MELT LAUNDER AND A MELT LAUNDER[2014/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CHENAL DE COULÉE DE FUSION ET CHENAL DE COULÉE DE FUSION[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2014National basic fee paid 
12.08.2014Search fee paid 
12.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
29.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2018Fee for grant paid
20.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2016
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/26]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]JPH11189830  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [I] 1-24 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] *;
 [A]EP1752726  (ALUAR ALUMINIO ARGENTINO S A I [AR]) [A] 1-24 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] *;
 [A]DE10223606  (SCHOTT GLAS FA [DE]) [A] 1-24 * figures 1, 4, 6 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] *;
 [A]GB2049135  (METACON AG) [A] 1-24 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 125 - column 3, line 12 * * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]AT379172B  (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) [A] 1-24 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 8 *;
 [A]WO2010000940  (OUTOTEC OYJ [FI], et al) [A] 1-24 * figures 2-4 * * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 18 *
International search[A]US2011140318  (REEVES ERIC W [US], et al);
 [A]US5744093  (DAVIS JOHN ALBERT [CA]);
 [A]US4269399  (TINNES BERNHARD, et al);
 [A]US4531717  (HEBRANT GEORGES [US]);
 [A]US7264769  (AFELTRA UMBERTO [IT], et al)
by applicantWO03033982
 JPH11189830