Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813401

EP2813401 - PRETENSIONER MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Rika Denki Seisakusho
260 Toyota 3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun
Aichi 480-0195 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / YANAGAWA, Wataru
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO
260 Toyota 3-chome
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP
02 / UKITA, Masaru
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO
260 Toyota 3-chome
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP
03 / YAMAZOE, Hiroaki
c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO
260 Toyota 3-chome
Ohguchi-cho
Niwa-gun Aichi 480-0195 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13747097.706.02.2013
[2017/36]
WO2013JP52757
Priority number, dateJP2012002750410.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012027504
[2014/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118780
Date:15.08.2013
Language:JA
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813401
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813401
Date:06.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.08.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/46
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORSPANNMECHANISMUS[2014/51]
English:PRETENSIONER MECHANISM[2014/51]
French:MÉCANISME DE PRÉTENDEUR[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2014Translation filed 
02.01.2014National basic fee paid 
02.01.2014Search fee paid 
02.01.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
15.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2017Fee for grant paid
31.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2017
Opposition(s)07.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
IE06.02.2018
LU06.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
IE06.02.2018
LU06.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
LU06.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/15]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2012006927  (NAGATA TOMONORI [JP] ET AL) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0074]; figure 2 * [A] 1-8;
 [A]US6318662  (HORI SEIJI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 42 - column 15, line 35; figures 1-5 *
International search[X]JP2001151077  (TAKATA CORP.);
 [X]JP2003535751  (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LABORATORY, INC.);
 [A]JP2000313311  (ASHIMORI INDUSTRY CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2008285136