Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2813401


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
28.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
13.07.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
19.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
04.08.2017 (Expected) grant published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
02.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.08.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.08.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.04.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.04.2016 Amendment by applicant
01.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.09.2015 Change - classification published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
18.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
17.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
04.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
26.02.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication